Bulcock v. Unilife Corporation et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-03976 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | May 26, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 22, 2016 5:38 AM EST |
Consolidated Plaintiff
Manuel Antigua Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jim Bosnjak
|
|
Defendant
David C. Hastings
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dennis P. Pyers
|
|
Defendant
John Ryan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alan Shortall
|
|
Defendant
Unilife Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
R. Richard Wieland II
|
Represented By
|
Lead Plaintiff
Richard Carrazza
|
Represented By
|
Lead Plaintiff
Richard Farino
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Fred Assefi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bill Bulcock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Manuel Quintero Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
72 | 72
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
Thu 12/06 10:09 AM
ORDER granting69 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED THAT: 1. This Order incorporates by reference the definitions in the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement dated March 22, 2017 (ECF No. 53-1) (the "Stipulation") and the Cormio Declaration, and all terms used herein shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Stipulation and the Cormio Declaration. 2. This Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of the Action and over all parties to the Action, including all Settlement Class Members. 3. The proposed plan for distributing the Net Settlement Fund (the "Distribution Plan") as set forth in the Cormio Declaration to Authorized Claimants is APPROVED as set forth in this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/4/2018) (rj) |