MOBE, Ltd v. Digital Altitude LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-05708 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:0106 Motion Pictures & Other Audiovisual Works |
Case Filed: | Aug 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 28, 2017 1:38 AM PST |
Counter Claimant
Digital Altitude LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Michael Force
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
MOBE, Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Digital Altitude LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Force
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MOBE, Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
198 | 198
3
pgs
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Mon 10/16 2:50 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (mrgo) |
|
Att: 1 Dismissal | ||
197 | 197
2
pgs
order
Dismissing Case
Mon 10/16 2:05 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case196 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
196 | 196
2
pgs
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 10/11 5:41 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Plaintiff MOBE, Ltd.(Hottinger, Tyson) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
195 | 195
2
pgs
transcript
Transcript Order Form (G-120)
Tue 10/10 1:21 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff MOBE, Ltd for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Cathy Nickol at cnickol@mabr.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder. (Hottinger, Tyson) |
|
194 | 194
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 10/10 12:01 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.3.1, documents filed electronically must be submitted in Portable Document Format ("PDF"), created using word-processing software, and published to PDF from the original word-processing file to permit the electronic version of the document to be searched. Other than signature pages, PDF IMAGES CREATED BY SCANNING PAPER DOCUMENTS ARE PROHIBITED. Violation of Local Rule 5-4.3.1 may result in the striking of the offending document and the imposition of monetary or other sanctions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY |
|
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
193 | 193
transcript
Transcript Order Form (G-120)
Mon 10/09 12:56 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Digital Altitude LLC, Michael Force for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Christina Rodriguez at crodriguez@onellp.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder. (Lobbin, Stephen) |