39
|
|
39
order
Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order
Fri 10/04 9:29 AM
STIPULATED ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendants and Without Costs. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Related: [-]
|
38
|
|
38
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 09/11 1:24 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hamtramck, City (Johnson, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
|
37
|
|
37
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 07/25 3:06 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Related: [-]
|
36
|
|
36
order
Staying Case
Wed 07/25 2:44 PM
STIPULATED ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Related: [-]
|
35
|
|
35
misc
Attorney Appearance
Wed 06/06 2:18 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James P. Allen appearing on behalf of Hamtramck, City, Daniel Kruse (Allen, James)
Related: [-]
|
34
|
|
34
misc
Attorney Appearance
Thu 05/03 12:19 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lindsey R. Johnson appearing on behalf of Hamtramck, City, Daniel Kruse (Johnson, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
|
33
|
|
33
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 04/19 3:39 PM
STIPULATED ORDER Extending All Dates by 120 Days, ( Discovery due by 8/6/2018 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/7/2018 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2018 01:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood , Jury Trial set for 1/15/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood ) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Related: [-]
|
32
|
|
32
order
Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney
Tue 04/17 3:05 PM
ORDER of Attorney Substitution. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
|
31
|
|
31
notice
Appearance
Wed 04/04 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Allen on behalf of Hamtramck, City, Daniel Kruse. (Allen, James)
Related: [-]
|
30
|
|
30
trial
Witness List
Wed 01/03 2:56 PM
Plaintiff's Final WITNESS LIST by Jibreel Montalvo (Puzzuoli, Gina)
Related: [-]
|
29
|
|
29
trial
Witness List
Wed 01/03 2:05 PM
WITNESS LIST by Ryan McInerney (Morris, G.)
Related: [-]
|
28
|
|
28
misc
Attorney Appearance
Thu 12/21 11:38 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher J. Raiti appearing on behalf of Ryan McInerney (Raiti, Christopher)
Related: [-]
|
27
|
|
27
misc
Attorney Appearance
Thu 12/21 11:26 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: G. Gus Morris appearing on behalf of Ryan McInerney (Morris, G.)
Related: [-]
|
26
|
|
26
order
Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney
Thu 12/21 11:07 AM
ORDER Allowing Substitution of Attorneys. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (SOso)
Related: [-]
|
25
|
|
25
misc
Attorney Substitution
Thu 12/14 3:26 PM
ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Ryan McInerney: G. Gus Morris added. (Morris, G.)
Related: [-]
|
24
|
|
24
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 11/30 4:02 PM
STIPULATED ORDER Amending Scheduling Order, ( Discovery due by 4/5/2018 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/3/2018 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2018 03:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood , Jury Trial set for 9/11/2018 09:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood ) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Related: [-]
|
23
|
|
23
trial
Witness List
Fri 10/06 2:27 PM
DEFENDANTS' WITNESS LIST by All Defendants (Clark, John)
Related: [-]
|
22
|
|
22
notice
Appearance
Fri 10/06 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony K Chubb on behalf of All Defendants. (Chubb, Anthony)
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
order
Protective Order
Thu 09/14 3:15 PM
Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Tue 06/27 1:50 PM
ORDER allowing withdraw of counsel (Attorney John T. Mihelick). Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (DPer)
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
notice
Withdrawal of Attorney
Mon 06/19 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney John T. Mihelick for on behalf of All Defendants. (Mihelick, John)
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
order
Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney
Mon 04/17 1:39 PM
CONSENT of SUBSTITUTION and ORDER of Substitution of Attorneys. Attorney Gina U. Puzzuoli for Jibreel Montalvo added. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (DWor)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
order
Text-Only Order
Mon 04/17 12:13 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER STRIKING 17 Consent filed by Jibreel Montalvo. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 03/28 1:20 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/5/2018 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/2/2018 Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2018 02:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Jury Trial set for 5/22/2018 09:00 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. Related [+] (LSau)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
|
|
|
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 03/28 1:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Denise Page Hood: Scheduling Conference held on 3/27/2017 (LSau)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
notice
Appearance
Wed 03/15 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. O'Mara on behalf of Ryan McInerney. (O'Mara, Sean)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
notice
Appear*
Fri 03/10 2:19 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2017 03:30 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/06 4:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance by Ryan McInerney. (Clark, John)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
notice
Appearance
Mon 03/06 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Mihelick on behalf of Ryan McInerney. (Mihelick, John)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
notice
Appearance
Mon 03/06 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Clark on behalf of Ryan McInerney. (Clark, John)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
service
Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed
Wed 02/22 11:51 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ryan McInerney served on 2/22/2017, answer due 3/15/2017. (Felty, Gary)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 02/21 3:37 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand Reliance by Hamtramck, City, Daniel Kruse. (Clark, John)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Fri 01/20 10:20 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Hamtramck, City (Clark, John)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day
Fri 01/20 10:18 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Hamtramck, City waiver sent on 1/5/2017, answer due 3/6/2017; Daniel Kruse waiver sent on 1/5/2017, answer due 3/6/2017. (Clark, John)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
notice
Appearance
Fri 01/20 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Mihelick on behalf of Hamtramck, City, Daniel Kruse. (Mihelick, John)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
notice
Appearance
Fri 01/20 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Clark on behalf of Hamtramck, City, Daniel Kruse. (Clark, John)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Summons Issued*
Wed 01/04 3:46 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Ryan McInerney* (DAll)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Summons Issued*
Wed 01/04 3:42 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Daniel Kruse* (DAll)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
service
Summons Issued*
Wed 01/04 3:42 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Hamtramck, City* (DAll)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Fri 12/30 3:33 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6021268 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Felty, Gary)
Related: [-]
|