Crytek GmbH v. Cloud Imperium Games Corp. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-08937 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 20, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 10, 2018 2:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
Cloud Imperium Games Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Roberts Space Industries Corp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crytek GmbH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
130 | 130
misc
Financial Entry
Mon 04/13 2:15 PM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Disbursed $505,225.75 from the registry of the Court to Erise IP, P.A. on 04/10/2020. Re: Order,, Distribution of Funds,129 . (pri) |