Kane v. Cumia et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Colleen Mcmahon |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00414 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 16, 2018 4:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
Anthony Cumia POD Cast
|
|
Defendant
Compound Media
|
|
Defendant
Anthony Cumia
|
|
Defendant
Keith Maresca
|
|
Plaintiff
Sandra (Sandy) Kane
400 West 43rd Street Apt. 6K
New York, NY 10036 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Keith (Anthony's Prod.)
Terminated: 03/01/2018
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 08/03 2:46 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to9 Notice of Appeal filed by Sandra (Sandy) Kane. USCA Case Number 18-1207 Ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 08/03/2018. (nd) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Mon 05/14 7:46 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Sandy Kane dated 5/7/18 re: Plaintiff informs the Court that she is working with the law firm of Salzano, Jackson & Lampert LLP; and that they have told her that this case belongs in state court, not in federal court etc.; and she requests an extension. Document filed by Sandra (Sandy) Kane.(sc) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 04/24 12:00 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from7 Order of Dismissal. Document filed by Sandra (Sandy) Kane. Form D-P is due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (tp) |
|
appeal
Appeal Fee Due
Tue 04/24 12:00 PM
Appeal Fee Due: for9 Notice of Appeal. Appeal fee due by 5/8/2018. (tp) |
||
appeal
Appeal Remark
Tue 04/24 12:01 PM
Appeal Remark as to9 Notice of Appeal filed by Sandra (Sandy) Kane. IFP DENIED 03/26/2018. (tp) |
||
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 04/24 12:01 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:9 Notice of Appeal. (tp) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
Tue 04/24 12:02 PM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for9 Notice of Appeal filed by Sandra (Sandy) Kane were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) |
||
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint)
Mon 03/26 3:12 PM
CIVIL JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the order issued March 26, 2018, dismissing the amended complaint, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the amended complaint is dismissed without prejudice under Rule 12(h)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/26/2018) (mro) |
|
7 | 7
5
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Mon 03/26 3:09 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court dismisses the amended complaint without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/26/2018) (mro) |
|
misc
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
Mon 03/26 3:13 PM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:7 Order of Dismissal,8 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint), to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (mro) |
||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Mon 03/26 3:42 PM
Mailed a copy of7 Order of Dismissal8 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint) to Sandra (Sandy) Kane 400 West 43rd Street Apt. 6K New York, NY 10036 with right to appeal forms attached. (mhe) |
||
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Fri 03/09 9:31 AM
Mailed a copy of6 Order Granting IFP Application to Sandra (Sandy) Kane, 400 West 43rd Street, Apt. 6K, New York, NY 10036. (rro) |
||
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Granting IFP Application
Thu 03/08 5:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/8/2018) (sac) |
|
misc
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
Thu 03/08 5:34 PM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:6 Order Granting IFP Application, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (sac) |
||
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/02 11:34 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT; re: amending2 Complaint against Anthony Cumia POD Cast, Compound Media, Anthony Cumia, Keith Maresca with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sandra (Sandy) Kane. Related document:2 Complaint.(sc) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/02 11:27 AM
AMENDED APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Sandra (Sandy) Kane.(sc) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application Order Directing Original Signature
Fri 01/19 10:01 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States , 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). ( Filing Fee due by 2/20/2018., In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 2/20/2018.), ORDER DIRECTING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE: Plaintiff is directed to submit a signed signature page to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States , 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). ( Signature Page due by 2/20/2018.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/19/2018)(dol) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Amended IFP Application, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Signature Page | ||
misc
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
Fri 01/19 10:02 AM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, Order Directing Original Signature,,,,,,,,,,, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (dol) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte
Fri 01/19 10:11 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) |
||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Fri 01/19 12:08 PM
Mailed a copy of3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, Order Directing Original Signature to Sandra (Sandy) Kane, 400 West 43rd Street, Apt. 6K, New York, NY 10036. (rro) |
||
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/17 4:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Anthony Cumia POD Cast, Compound Media, Anthony Cumia, Keith (Anthony's Prod.). Document filed by Sandra (Sandy) Kane.(sac) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 01/17 4:42 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Sandra (Sandy) Kane.(sac) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 01/17 4:43 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sac) |