BioAmber Inc. and BioAmber Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 15 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-11291 |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 15, 2019 |
Debtor
BioAmber Inc.
1000 Westgate Drive Suite 115
St. Paul, MN 55114 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Sunday Jun 28, 2020 11:01 PM EDT |
Creditor
Mitsui & Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Foreign Representative
BioAmber Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Peter R. Carlson V.P./Property Manager
|
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago |
Wednesday, October 28, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
13
pgs
misc
Transcript
Wed 10/28 11:15 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 10/09/2018 RE: Motion of the Foreign Representative for Entry of an Order (I) Recognizing Canadian Sale Order, (II) Authorizing and Approving Sale of Assets, and (III) Granting Related Relief. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/26/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at Telephone number 302-654-8080. Filed by . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/4/2020. Redaction Request Due By 11/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/30/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/26/2021. (LBr) |
|
Friday, October 23, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
court
Request for Transcript
Fri 10/23 2:24 PM
Request for Transcript of hearing held on October 9, 2018 received. To obtain a copy of this transcript, contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Reliable Companies , Telephone number 302-654-8080 . |
|
Wednesday, July 01, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
21
pgs
misc
Transcript
Wed 07/01 3:22 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 6/20/2018 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/29/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at Telephone number 302 654-8080. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/8/2020. Redaction Request Due By 7/22/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/3/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/29/2020. (NAB) |
|
Tuesday, June 30, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
court
Request for Transcript
Tue 06/30 2:59 PM
Request for Transcript of hearing held on June 20, 2018 received. To obtain a copy of this transcript, contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Reliable Companies , Telephone number 302-654-8080 . |
|
Friday, November 15, 2019 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 11/15 1:48 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NAB) |
||
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
3
pgs
order
Final Decree
Thu 11/14 5:08 PM
Order (I) Closing Chapter 15 Case and (II) Granting Related Relief Order Signed on 11/14/2019. (LJJ) |
|
Att: 1 22 pgs Exhibit 1 | ||
34 | 34
2
pgs
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Aty)
Thu 11/14 1:42 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion for Entry of Order (I) Closing Chapter 15 Case and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1 26 pgs Exhibit A | ||
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
6
pgs
misc
Final Report
Fri 10/04 9:19 PM
Final Report of BioAmber Inc. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 5009(c) Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Certificate of Service and Service List | ||
32 | 32
10
pgs
motion
Final Decree - Motion
Fri 10/04 9:14 PM
Motion for Final Decree /Motion for Entry of Order (I) Closing Chapter 15 Case and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by BioAmber Inc.. Objections due by 11/4/2019. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Notice | ||
Att: 2 26 pgs Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 5 pgs Certificate of Service and Service List | ||
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
notice
Settlement - Notice
Tue 10/16 3:38 PM
Notice of Settlement Regarding Park Avenue of Wayzata, Inc. and BioAmber Inc. Filed by Peter R. Carlson V.P./Property Manager. (NAB) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
5
pgs
order
Motion to Approve Sale
Wed 10/10 9:30 AM
Order (I) Recognizing Canadian Sale Order, (II) Authorizing and Approving Sale of Assets, and (III) Granting Related Relief Order Signed on 10/10/2018. (CMB) |
|
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit 1 | ||
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
2
pgs
court
Minute Entry
Tue 10/09 3:55 PM
Minute Entry: Hearing held and Motion approved. Order to be signed. Re:24 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. - Appearances: See attached sign-in sheet. (LJJ) |
|
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 10/09 11:35 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Erica J. Richards Order Signed on 10/9/2018. (CMB) |
|
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 10/09 11:35 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of John A. Pintarelli. Order Signed on 10/9/2018. (CMB) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Thu 10/04 12:45 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of Erica J. Richards . Receipt Number 0311-24741, Filed by Mitsui & Co., Ltd.. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
25 | 25
1
pgs
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Thu 10/04 12:43 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of John A. Pintarelli . Receipt Number 0311-24741, Filed by Mitsui & Co., Ltd.. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
24 | 24
2
pgs
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Thu 10/04 11:45 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by BioAmber Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 10/9/2018 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1 6 pgs Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
3
pgs
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 10/04 1:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 10/03/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
5
pgs
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/02 4:19 PM
Certificate of Service regarding Reservation of Rights of Mitsui & Co., Ltd. with Respect to Proposed Sale Recognition Order Filed by Mitsui & Co., Ltd.. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
21 | 21
4
pgs
misc
Reservation of Rights
Tue 10/02 3:03 PM
Reservation of Rights of Mitsui & Co., Ltd. with Respect to Proposed Sale Recognition Order Filed by Mitsui & Co., Ltd.. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
20 | 20
3
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Tue 10/02 3:00 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Mitsui & Co., Ltd.. (Cohen, Howard) |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
court
VAN-489 Notice of Deficiency-Alt
Mon 10/01 4:10 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing Tickle due by: 10/15/2018. (NAB) |
|
18 | 18
2
pgs
misc
Letter (Bk)
Mon 10/01 4:06 PM
Letter regarding past due Rent Statements for June, July, August 2018. Filed by Peter R. Carlson V.P./Property Manager . (NAB) |
|
17 | 17
2
pgs
misc
Exhibit
Mon 10/01 3:44 PM
Exhibit(s) // Notice Of Filing Exhibit D To Motion Of Foreign Representative For Entry Of An Order (I) Recognizing Canadian Sale Order, (II) Authorizing And Approving Sale Of Assets, And (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1 18 pgs Exhibit D | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
6
pgs
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 09/21 4:03 PM
Certificate of Service re: Motion to Approve Sale /Motion of Foreign Representative for Entry of an Order (I) Recognizing Canadian Sale Order, (II) Authorizing and Approving Sale of Assets, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
19
pgs
motion
Approve Sale - Motion
Thu 09/20 9:59 PM
Motion to Approve Sale /Motion of Foreign Representative for Entry of an Order (I) Recognizing Canadian Sale Order, (II) Authorizing and Approving Sale of Assets, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by BioAmber Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 10/9/2018 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/2/2018. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Notice | ||
Att: 2 26 pgs Exhibit A - Third Initial Order | ||
Att: 3 36 pgs Exhibit B - Asset Purchase Agreement | ||
Att: 4 7 pgs Exhibit C - Arlette Declaration | ||
Att: 5 12 pgs Exhibit D - Proposed Recognition Order | ||
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
9
pgs
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 06/21 3:56 PM
Certificate of Service Regarding [Signed] Order Granting Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Certain Related Relief Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
7
pgs
order
Authorize
Wed 06/20 2:39 PM
Order Granting Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Certain Related Relief Order Signed on 6/20/2018. (CMB) |
|
12 | 12
2
pgs
court
Minute Entry
Wed 06/20 2:35 PM
Minute Entry: Hearing Held and orders signed. Re:11 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. - Appearances: See attached sign-in sheet. (LJJ) |
|
11 | 11
4
pgs
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Wed 06/20 10:45 AM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by BioAmber Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/20/2018 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
4
pgs
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Mon 06/18 12:24 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by BioAmber Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/20/2018 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Aty)
Mon 06/18 12:13 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion of Foreign Representative for Entry of Order Granting Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Certain Related Relief Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 06/04 4:17 PM
Certificate of Service Regarding Memorandum of Law of Foreign Representative in Support of (I) Verified Chapter 15 Petition and (II) Motion of Foreign Representative for Order Granting Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Certain Related Relief Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 06/04 4:15 PM
Certificate of Service Regarding Motion of Foreign Representative for Entry of Order Granting Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Certain Related Relief Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
6 | 6
3
pgs
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 06/04 4:13 PM
Certificate of Service Regarding Declaration of Mario Settino in Support of (I) Verified Chapter 11 Petition; and (II) Motion of Foreign Representative for Entry of Order Granting Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Certain Related Relief Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Sunday, June 03, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
crditcrd
none
Sun 06/03 4:48 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Petition Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15) 18-11291 [misc,volpfp15] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8892570, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
court
Case Assigned
Thu 05/31 8:02 AM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case (LB) |
||
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
16
pgs
misc
Memorandum of Law
Wed 05/30 10:36 PM
Memorandum of Law of Foreign Representative in Support of (I) Verified Chapter 15 Petition and (II) Motion of Foreign Representative for Order Granting Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Certain Related Relief Filed by BioAmber Inc.. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
3 | 3
19
pgs
motion
Authorize - Motion
Wed 05/30 10:31 PM
Motion to Authorize /Motion of Foreign Representative for Entry of Order Granting Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Certain Related Relief Filed by BioAmber Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/20/2018 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/13/2018. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Recognition Order | ||
2 | 2
15
pgs
first
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion
Wed 05/30 10:25 PM
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion /Declaration of Mario Settino in Support of (I) Verified Chapter 11 Petition; and (II) Motion of Foreign Representative for Entry of Order Granting Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Certain Related Relief Filed By BioAmber Inc.(Robinson, Colin) |
|
Att: 1 19 pgs Exhibit A - CCAA Initial Order | ||
1 | 1
30+
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Petition Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15)
Wed 05/30 9:46 PM
Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by BioAmber Inc., Laura Davis Jones. (Jones, Laura Davis) |