ANDERER v. MCBRIDE
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-16309
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-16309
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Judge: | August B Landis |
Case #: | 2:21-ap-01023 |
Nature of Suit | 67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny 68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
DARL CHARLES MCBRIDE, AN INDIVIDUAL
322 KAREN AVENUE #1206
LAS VEGAS, NV 89109 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL E. ANDERER, AN INDIVIDUAL
2300 W SAHARA AVE, STE 1200
LAS VEGAS, NV 89102 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM PDT |
Monday, January 10, 2022 | ||
44 | 44
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 01/10 1:58 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (mmm) |
|
Thursday, December 16, 2021 | ||
43 | 43
adv_misc
Certificate of Service (ADV)
Thu 12/16 10:21 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
42 | 42
notice
Entry of Order (Adv)
Thu 12/16 10:18 AM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, Without Prejudice Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
40 | 40
orderad
Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC)
Thu 12/16 7:58 AM
Stipulated/Agreed Order By and Between MICHAEL E. ANDERER and DARL CHARLES MCBRIDE, Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC) (mmm) |
|
Wednesday, December 15, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
adv_misc
Stipulation (Adv)
Wed 12/15 3:24 PM
Stipulation By MICHAEL E. ANDERER and Between DARL McBRIDE to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, Without Prejudice Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
Tuesday, December 14, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
court
Minute Entry Continued (ADV)
Tue 12/14 1:01 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 12/14/2021 10:00 AM. Continued. Appearances: BENJAMIN CHAMBLISS, RYAN J. WORKS Status Hearing to be held on 02/08/2022 at 10:00 AM at ABL Teleconference Line. (anm) |
|
37 | 37
court
Minute Entry Hearing Off Calendar
Tue 12/14 12:58 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 12/14/2021 10:00 AM. Hearing Off Calendar (anm) |
|
court
Minute Entry Continued (ADV)
Tue 12/14 1:03 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 12/14/2021 10:00 AM. Continued. Appearance: RYAN J. WORKS (Hearing scheduled 02/08/2022 at 10:00 AM at ABL Teleconference Line. (anm) |
||
Tuesday, November 23, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
court
Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC)
Tue 11/23 12:28 PM
Notice of Docketing Error (mmm) |
|
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice (BK)
Mon 11/22 1:27 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by GEORGE HAINES on behalf of DARL CHARLES MCBRIDE (HAINES, GEORGE) |
|
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
adv_misc
Certificate of Service (ADV)
Thu 11/18 11:21 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
Wednesday, November 17, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Entry of Order (Adv)
Wed 11/17 5:44 PM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment Granting Stipulation to Vacate Settlement Conference Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
32 | 32
court
Minute Entry - Hearing Vacated Per Order Entered on Docket (ADV)
Wed 11/17 1:55 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 11/18/2021 9:30 AM. Vacated Per Order Entered on Docket. Docket Number 31 (pal) |
|
31 | 31
orderad
Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv)
Wed 11/17 1:29 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order By and Between Plaintiff MICHAEL ANDERER and Defendant DARL McBRIDE (mmm) |
|
30 | 30
adv_misc
Attorney Information Sheet (Adv)
Wed 11/17 12:30 PM
Attorney Information Sheet For Ex Parte Motion For Order Shortening Time Re: Plaintiff Michael Anderer's Motion to Extend Discovery and Amend Scheduling Order Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
29 | 29
adv_misc
Declaration (ADV)
Wed 11/17 12:26 PM
Omnibus Declaration Of: Kevin A. Turney, Esq. In Support of Ex Parte Motion For Order Shortening Time and Plaintiff Michael Anderer's Motion to Extend Discovery and Amend Scheduling Order Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
28 | 28
6
pgs
motion
Order Shortening Time (Adv)
Wed 11/17 12:24 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time Re: Plaintiff Michael Anderer's Motion to Extend Discovery and Amend Scheduling Order Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Extend Time (Adv)
Wed 11/17 12:21 PM
Motion to Extend Time Plaintiff Michael Anderer's Motion to Extend Discovery and Amend Scheduling Order Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Wed 11/17 12:17 PM
Stipulation By MICHAEL E. ANDERER and Between DARL McBRIDE to Vacate Settlement Conference Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
Wednesday, November 10, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
order
Withdraw As Attorney of Record (Adv)
Wed 11/10 4:46 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney of Record KEVIN MCBRIDE terminated from the case. (ccc) |
|
Tuesday, November 09, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv)
Tue 11/09 9:14 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 12/14/2021 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (mmm) |
|
Monday, November 08, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
adv_misc
Certificate of Service (ADV)
Mon 11/08 9:50 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Hearing (Adv)
Mon 11/08 9:25 AM
Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff Michael Anderers Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Production of Documents Hearing Date: 12/14/2021 Hearing Time: 10:00 a.m. Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
Friday, November 05, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
adv_misc
Declaration (ADV)
Fri 11/05 6:28 PM
Declaration Of: Kevin A. Turney, Esq. In Support of Plaintiff Michael Anderer's Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Production of Documents Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Compel (ADV)
Fri 11/05 6:24 PM
Motion to Compel Plaintiff Michael Anderer's Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Production of Documents Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
Friday, October 08, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv)
Fri 10/08 3:27 PM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 11/9/2021 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (mmm) |
|
Thursday, September 30, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Withdraw as Attorney of Record (Adv)
Thu 09/30 1:20 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendant Filed by KEVIN MCBRIDE on behalf of DARL CHARLES MCBRIDE (MCBRIDE, KEVIN) |
|
17 | 17
court
Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC)
Thu 09/30 9:07 AM
Notice of Docketing Error (mmm) |
|
Wednesday, September 29, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
adv_misc
Certificate of Service (ADV)
Wed 09/29 12:12 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by KEVIN MCBRIDE on behalf of DARL CHARLES MCBRIDE (MCBRIDE, KEVIN) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Hearing (Adv)
Wed 09/29 12:10 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Hearing Date: 11/09/2021 Hearing Time: 10:00 Filed by KEVIN MCBRIDE on behalf of DARL CHARLES MCBRIDE (MCBRIDE, KEVIN) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Withdraw Document (Adv)
Wed 09/29 12:07 PM
Motion to Withdraw Document Filed by KEVIN MCBRIDE on behalf of DARL CHARLES MCBRIDE (MCBRIDE, KEVIN) |
|
Thursday, June 24, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
orderad
Scheduling Order (BNC)
Thu 06/24 2:19 PM
Scheduling Order (BNC) Status Hearing to be held on 12/14/2021 at 10:00 AM at Remote.Settlement Conference scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (mmm) |
|
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
court
Minute Entry Continued (ADV)
Wed 06/23 7:59 AM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 6/22/2021 10:00 AM. Continued. Appearances: KEVIN MCBRIDE, KEVIN A. TURNEY, RYAN J. WORKS Scheduling Conference scheduled for 12/14/2021 at 10:00 AM at ABL Teleconference Line. (anm) |
|
Tuesday, June 08, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
adv_misc
Standard Discovery Plan/Request for Waiver of Filing Discovery Plan
Tue 06/08 3:11 PM
Discovery Plan Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
Tuesday, March 23, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
adv_misc
Designation of Local Counsel (Adv)
Tue 03/23 3:25 PM
Designation of Local Counsel Filed by GEORGE HAINES on behalf of DARL CHARLES MCBRIDE (HAINES, GEORGE) |
|
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
order
Miscellaneous Application
Mon 03/22 8:41 AM
Order Granting Ex-Parte Motion Of Kevin McBride To Accept Previously Filed Verified Petition To Practice In This Case (cly) |
|
Friday, March 19, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Application
Fri 03/19 11:35 AM
Ex Parte Application to Accept Previously-Filed Verified Petition to Practice in this Case, and to Waive Filing Fee, Filed by KEVIN MCBRIDE on behalf of DARL CHARLES MCBRIDE (MCBRIDE, KEVIN) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/19 9:16 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by KEVIN MCBRIDE on behalf of DARL CHARLES MCBRIDE (MCBRIDE, KEVIN) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Thu 02/18 12:25 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 21-01023 abl) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number per court order, fee amount $ 350.00 (Burks, LG) (Burks) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
adv_misc
Certificate of Service (ADV)
Wed 02/17 12:11 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL E. ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Wed 02/17 10:27 AM
Summons Issued on DARL CHARLES MCBRIDE (cly) |
|
3 | 3
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Wed 02/17 10:27 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 6/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (cly) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Request to Issue Summons
Tue 02/16 5:42 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: DARL CHARLES MCBRIDE. Filed by RYAN J. WORKS on behalf of MICHAEL ANDERER (WORKS, RYAN) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 02/16 5:40 PM
Adversary case 21-01023 Complaint Objecting to Dischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 523 Filed by MICHAEL ANDERER vs. DARL CHARLES MCBRIDE Fee Amount $350. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)(WORKS, RYAN) |