Zhang et al v. Voice of Guo Media Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Susan M Brnovich |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01079 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 19, 2021 2:50 AM MST |
Defendant
GTV Media Group Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wengui Guo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rule of Law Foundation III Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rule of Law Society IV Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Saraca Media Group Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Voice of Guo Media Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Sara Wei
|
|
Plaintiff
Chong Shen Raphanella
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Xiaodan Wang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rong Zhang
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
107 | 107
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Mon 03/11 10:40 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan M. Brnovich: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/11/2024. Discussion held as to the status of Defendant Guo's other pending matters. IT IS ORDERED setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 7/15/2024 at 9:15 AM (15 minutes allowed). The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via e-mail prior to the hearing. TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES: Attorney Malcolm Brown, Bernard Daskal and Lillian Grinnell for Plaintiffs. Counsel for Defendants or Defendants not present. (Court Reporter Christine Coaly) Hearing held 10:02 AM to 10:05 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG) |