Karben4 Brewing, LLC
Wisconsin Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Catherine J Furay |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-10358 |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Karben4 Brewing, LLC
3698 Kinsman Blvd
Madison, WI 53704-2509 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee's Office
780 Regent Street, Suite 304
Madison, WI 53715 |
1. | Karben4 Brewing files Chapter 11 bankruptcy, will continue operating (channel3000.com) |
Submitted Thu 02/29/2024 | |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
140 | 140
motion
Compensation
Thu 05/02 4:28 PM
Application for Compensation - Interim Fee Request for April 2024 by Kerkman & Dunn, Debtor's Attorney (fees: $56516.40, expenses: $1257.86). filed by Jerome R. Kerkman, Kerkman & Dunn. Notice/Proof of Service - Last Day to File Objections/Request for Hearing: 5/9/2024. (Kerkman, Jerome) |
|
139 | 139
chap
Hearing Rescheduled (CJF office 3 conference line) - use to reschedule
Thu 05/02 12:07 PM
FINAL hearing scheduled for 05/07/2024 at 10:00 AM at Madison Hearings, Courtroom 350 on Motion by Alexander Evans to Dismiss Case or in Alternative, to Remove Debtor-in-Possession. This reschedules the final hearing previously set to start at 9:00 AM. ***This docket entry serves as electronic notice.*** (Doc # 73) (Madison, Tina) |
|
138 | 138
chap
Hearing Held
Thu 05/02 12:01 PM
PM/Status Hearing Held on Motion by Alexander Evans to Dismiss Case or in Alternative, to Remove Debtor-in-Possession. OUTCOME : Final hearing is scheduled for one day, Tuesday, May 7th at 10:00 AM in Madison. The sole issue for hearing is whether ther was corporate authority for filing. (Doc # 73) (Madison, Tina) |
|
137 | 137
court
Hearing: Canceled
Thu 05/02 11:47 AM
Hearing Canceled re: Motion to Dismiss Case or in Alternative, to Remove Debtor-in-Possession . Originally scheduled for 5/6/2024 at 09:30 AM at Madison Hearings, Courtroom 350 . Canceled due to: The final hearing will be starting on Tuesday, May 7th at 10:00 AM . (Madison, Tina) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
136 | 136
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Wed 05/01 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document . No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 05/01/2024. (Admin.) |
|
135 | 135
misc
List of Exhibit(s)
Wed 05/01 6:04 PM
List of Exhibit(s) and Exhibits filed by Frank W. DiCastri on behalf of Alexander Evans. Related document(s)73 ,120 Motion to Dismiss Case or in Alternative, to Remove Debtor-in-Possession filed by Interested Party Alexander Evans, HEARING SCHEDULED/SCHEDULING ORDER. (DiCastri, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (s) 1 - Karben4 Operating Agreement | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit (s) 2 - Declaration of Disinterestedness | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit (s) 3 - Debtor's Original Schedules | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit (s) 4 - Debtor's Amended Schedule G | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit (s) 5 - Debtor's Amended Schedule A/B | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit (s) 6 - March 2024 BOA Receipt (Z. Koga) | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit (s) 7 - March 2024 BOA Receipt (R. Koga) | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit (s) 8 - April 2024 BOA Receipt (Z. Koga) | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit (s) 9 - April 2024 Receipt (R. Koga) | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit (s) 11 - Debtor's SOFA | ||
134 | 134
misc
List of Exhibit(s)
Wed 05/01 6:04 PM
List of Exhibit(s) of the Debtor filed by Jerome R. Kerkman on behalf of Karben4 Brewing, LLC. Related document(s)73 Motion to Dismiss Case or in Alternative, to Remove Debtor-in-Possession filed by Interested Party Alexander Evans. (Kerkman, Jerome) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (s) 100 - Articles of Organization | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit (s) 101 - Articles of Amendment | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit (s) 102 - Operating Agreement | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit (s) 103 - 4.1.12 Email String | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit (s) 104 - Email String July 5, 2012 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit (s) 105 - Draft Operating Agreement | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit (s) 106 - Email String re Operating Agreement Changes | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit (s) 107 - Lease Agreement | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit (s) 108 - Bernicks Agreement | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit (s) 109 - GB Agreement | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit (s) 110 - Lee Agreement | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit (s) Exhibit 111 - Triangle Agreement | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit (s) 112 - SBA Loan Documents | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit (s) 113 - Profit and Loss Statements | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit (s) 114 - Summary of Financial Information | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit (s) 115 - Balance Sheets | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit (s) 116 - Craft Beer Industry Article | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit (s) 117 - Forbes Article | ||
133 | 133
misc
List of Witness(es)
Wed 05/01 5:58 PM
List of Witness(es) filed by Frank W. DiCastri on behalf of Alexander Evans. Related document(s)120 ,73 Motion to Dismiss Case or in Alternative, to Remove Debtor-in-Possession filed by Interested Party Alexander Evans, HEARING SCHEDULED/SCHEDULING ORDER. (DiCastri, Frank) |
|
132 | 132
misc
Brief/Memorandum
Wed 05/01 5:57 PM
Brief/Memorandum In Support of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Frank W. DiCastri on behalf of Alexander Evans. Related document(s)120 ,73 Motion to Dismiss Case or in Alternative, to Remove Debtor-in-Possession filed by Interested Party Alexander Evans, HEARING SCHEDULED/SCHEDULING ORDER. (DiCastri, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (s) A - 341 Meeting Transcript | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit (s) B - Zachary Koga Deposition Transcript | ||
131 | 131
misc
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Wed 05/01 5:53 PM
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Relating to Motion to Dismiss filed by Frank W. DiCastri on behalf of Alexander Evans. Related document(s)120 ,73 Motion to Dismiss Case or in Alternative, to Remove Debtor-in-Possession filed by Interested Party Alexander Evans, HEARING SCHEDULED/SCHEDULING ORDER. (DiCastri, Frank) |
|
130 | 130
misc
List of Witness(es)
Wed 05/01 5:50 PM
List of Witness(es) filed by Jerome R. Kerkman on behalf of Karben4 Brewing, LLC. Related document(s)73 Motion to Dismiss Case or in Alternative, to Remove Debtor-in-Possession filed by Interested Party Alexander Evans. (Kerkman, Jerome) |
|
129 | 129
misc
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
Wed 05/01 5:49 PM
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Relating to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Alexander Evans filed by Jerome R. Kerkman on behalf of Karben4 Brewing, LLC. Related document(s)73 Motion to Dismiss Case or in Alternative, to Remove Debtor-in-Possession filed by Interested Party Alexander Evans. (Kerkman, Jerome) |
|
128 | 128
misc
Brief/Memorandum
Wed 05/01 5:47 PM
Brief/Memorandum of Law in Support of Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Relating to the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Alexander Evans filed by Jerome R. Kerkman on behalf of Karben4 Brewing, LLC. Related document(s)73 Motion to Dismiss Case or in Alternative, to Remove Debtor-in-Possession filed by Interested Party Alexander Evans. (Kerkman, Jerome) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
127 | 127
misc
Pre-Status Conference Report (Subchapter V)
Tue 04/30 3:24 PM
Pre-Status Conference Report Pursuant to Section 1188(c) filed by Jerome R. Kerkman on behalf of Karben4 Brewing, LLC. (Kerkman, Jerome) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
126 | 126
1
pgs
order
Order (generic)
Mon 04/29 2:35 PM
Order Modifying Final Pretrial Order cc: parties in int. Signed on 4/29/2024. (Eau Claire, Tara) |
|
125 | 125
court
Hearing: Sched/Cont/Resched (AUTO form)
Mon 04/29 11:59 AM
Status hearing scheduled for 5/2/2024 at 10:30 AM at Telephone Conference on Motion to Dismiss Case or in Alternative, to Remove Debtor-in-Possession . Parties should call the Court conference line at 1-877-336-1828, access code 8588228##, to participate in this telephonic hearing. ***This docket entry serves as electronic notice.*** The new pretrial submissions date is Wednesday, May 1, 2024. An order will be entered by the Court . (Madison, Tina) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
124 | 124
misc
Letter
Fri 04/26 2:36 PM
Letter Requesting Modification of Final Hearing Order filed by Frank W. DiCastri on behalf of Alexander Evans. Related document(s)89 ,120 HEARING SCHEDULED/SCHEDULING ORDER, HEARING SCHEDULED/SCHEDULING ORDER. (DiCastri, Frank) |