Judy Anne Mikovits v. Adam Garcia et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-08909 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2014 |
Terminated: | Feb 10, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday May 17, 2015 6:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Vincent Lombardi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Whittemore-Peterson Institute
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
F. Harvey Whittemore
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Annette F. Whittemore
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UNEVX Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Three Unidentified Ventura County Deputy Sherriffs
|
|
Defendant
Greg Pari
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jamie McGuire
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carli West Kinne
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kenneth Hunter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Hillerby
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Adam Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Gammick
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Geoff Dean
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy Anne Mikovits
140 Acacia Avenue Suite 5
Carlsbad, CA 92008 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, February 10, 2016 | ||
162 | 162
order
Strike Dismiss Dismiss Case
Fri 02/12 10:14 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: Proceedings: Order Dismissing the Case. The Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to meet the requirements of Rule 8 and the Court's November 8, 2015 order and dismisses the case. The Motions to Dismiss148 ,150 ,153 are GRANTED. The Motions to Strike147 ,151 are DENIED AS MOOT. The hearing scheduled for 2/22/16 is VACATED and OFF-CALENDAR. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (mg) |
|
161 | 161
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Wed 02/10 4:48 PM
REPLY support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Prayer for Punitive Damages Pursuant to Rule 12(f) 147 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 8, 12(b)(2), and 12(b)(6) Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Robert M. Dato; Affidavit of Kenneth Hunter 148 Combined Reply to Plaintiff's Untimely Opposition to Adam Garcia's, Jaime McGuire's and Kenneth Hunter's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Prayer for Punitive Damages filed by Defendants Adam Garcia, Kenneth Hunter, Jamie McGuire. (Dato, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2016 | ||
160 | 160
motion
Appear
Tue 02/09 4:08 PM
REQUEST for Leave of Brian W. Hagen to Appear for by Telephone at Motion Hearing filed by Defendants Michael Hillerby, Carli West Kinne, Vincent Lombardi, UNEVX Inc., Annette F. Whittemore, F. Harvey Whittemore, Whittemore-Peterson Institute. (Hagen, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration In Support of Telephonic Appearance, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Leave to Appear by Telephone | ||
159 | 159
19
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 02/09 11:35 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 153 filed by Plaintiff Judy Anne Mikovits.(Liskey, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 | ||
Monday, February 08, 2016 | ||
158 | 158
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Mon 02/08 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Prayer for Punitive Damages Pursuant to Rule 12(f) 147 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 8, 12(b)(2), and 12(b)(6) Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Robert M. Dato; Affidavit of Kenneth Hunter 148 Notice of Non-Receipt of Opposition to Adam Garcia's, Jaime McGuire's and Kenneth Hunter's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Prayer for Punitive Damages filed by Defendants Adam Garcia, Kenneth Hunter, Jamie McGuire. (Dato, Robert) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2016 | ||
157 | 157
motion
Leave
Fri 02/05 10:24 AM
REQUEST to appear by telephone filed by defendant Richard Gammick. Request set for hearing on 2/22/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Kandaras, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order |