169
|
|
169
motion
Employ/Retain - Application/Motion
Fri 05/03 1:44 AM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain White & Case LLP as Attorneys to the Debtors Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by WOM S.A.. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/17/2024. (Schlauch, Brendan)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit C
|
168
|
|
168
motion
Authorize - Motion
Wed 05/01 11:20 PM
Motion to Authorize // Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Authorizing the Retention and Payment of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business and (B) Granting Other Related Relief Filed by WOM S.A.. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/15/2024. (Steiger, Alexander)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
167
|
|
167
motion
Motion for Order Re: Interim Compensation Procedures
Wed 05/01 11:17 PM
Motion for Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals Filed by WOM S.A.. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/15/2024. (Steiger, Alexander)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
166
|
|
166
motion
Employ/Retain - Application/Motion
Wed 05/01 11:10 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. as Co-Counsel Filed by WOM S.A.. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/15/2024. (Steiger, Alexander)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit C
|
165
|
|
165
motion
Employ/Retain - Application/Motion
Wed 05/01 11:05 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC as Administrative Advisor Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Filed by WOM S.A.. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/15/2024. (Mathews, Emily)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit C
|
164
|
|
164
motion
Employ/Retain - Application/Motion
Wed 05/01 10:56 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Rothschild & Co US Inc. and Asesorias Financieras RP SpA as Financial Advisors and Investment Bankers Filed by WOM S.A.. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/15/2024. (Mathews, Emily)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit C
|
163
|
|
163
motion
Employ/Retain - Application/Motion
Wed 05/01 9:23 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Riveron RTS, LLC and Inversiones Moyano Luco Limitada LLC as Restructuring Advisors Filed by WOM S.A.. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/15/2024. (Schlauch, Brendan)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit B
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit C
|
162
|
|
162
misc
Declaration in Support
Wed 05/01 8:46 PM
Declaration in Support // Declaration of Eduardo Andres Jara Arnal in support of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing (I) Abandonment and Surrender of Certain Unused Licenses, (II) Payment of Certain Surety Bond Obligations Related to Surety Bonds, if Any, That Are Drawn in Connection Therewith, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by WOM S.A.. (Schlauch, Brendan)
|
161
|
|
161
motion
Authorize - Motion
Wed 05/01 8:35 PM
Motion to Authorize // Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing (I) Abandonment and Surrender of Certain Unused Licenses, (II) Payment of Certain Surety Bond Obligations Related to Surety Bonds, if Any, That Are Drawn in Connection Therewith, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by WOM S.A.. Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2024 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/15/2024. (Schlauch, Brendan)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A
|
160
|
|
160
notice
Deposition - Notice
Tue 04/30 7:25 PM
Notice of Deposition of Timothy P. O'Connor Related [+] Filed by Ad Hoc Group of WOM Noteholders. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert)
|
159
|
|
159
notice
Deposition - Notice
Tue 04/30 7:24 PM
Notice of Deposition of Jaroslav Valiukevic Related [+] Filed by Ad Hoc Group of WOM Noteholders. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert)
|
158
|
|
158
notice
Deposition - Notice
Tue 04/30 7:22 PM
Notice of Deposition of Marcelo Messer Related [+] Filed by Ad Hoc Group of WOM Noteholders. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert)
|
157
|
|
157
notice
Deposition - Notice
Tue 04/30 7:21 PM
Notice of Deposition of Thomas Leslie Related [+] Filed by Ad Hoc Group of WOM Noteholders. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert)
|
156
|
|
156
notice
Deposition - Notice
Tue 04/30 7:19 PM
Notice of Deposition of Robert Wagstaff Related [+] Filed by Ad Hoc Group of WOM Noteholders. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert)
|
155
|
|
155
notice
Deposition - Notice
Tue 04/30 7:16 PM
Notice of Deposition // Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition Directed to Debtors Related [+] Filed by Ad Hoc Group of WOM Noteholders. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert)
|
154
|
|
154
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/30 5:08 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Ad Hoc Group of WOM Noteholders. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert)
|
153
|
|
153
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/30 5:07 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Ad Hoc Group of WOM Noteholders. (Poppiti, Jr., Robert)
|
152
|
|
152
notice
Rescheduled Hearing - Notice
Fri 04/26 11:38 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing // the Hearing Originally Scheduled for 5/1/2024 at 2:00 PM has been rescheduled. Filed by WOM S.A.. Hearing scheduled for 5/20/2024 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
|