Number Holdings, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | J Kate Stickles |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10719 |
Case Filed: | Apr 07, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50,001-100,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Number Holdings, Inc.
1730 Flight Way Ste 100
Tustin, CA 92782-1840 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
1. | Retailer 99 Cents Only files for bankruptcy, plans to shut down (finance.yahoo.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/11/2024 | |
Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
344 | 344
notice
Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract - Notice
Thu 05/02 5:19 PM
Notice of Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract // Notice of Potential Assumption of Executory Contracts or Unexpired Leases and Cure Amounts . Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. (Talmo, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
343 | 343
notice
Appearance - Notice
Thu 05/02 4:22 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Harris County, et al. (Fuertes, Susan) |
|
342 | 342
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 05/02 12:19 PM
Certificate of Service Regarding Docket Nos. 335 & 341 Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Secured Noteholders. (Haywood, Brett) |
|
341 | 341
notice
Hearing - Notice
Thu 05/02 11:29 AM
Notice of Hearing Regarding Motion of Ad Hoc Group for Entry of an Order (I) Conditioning the Use, Sale, or Lease of Prepetition Collateral on the Provision of Adequate Protection as of the Petition Date and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Secured Noteholders. Hearing scheduled for 5/8/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/6/2024. (Haywood, Brett) |
|
340 | 340
notice
Withdrawal of Appearance - Notice
Thu 05/02 7:34 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. Katharina Earle has withdrawn from the case. Filed by North Valley Mall II LLC. (Earle, Katharina) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
339 | 339
notice
Hearing - Notice
Wed 05/01 6:47 PM
Notice of Hearing // Notice of Hearing Regarding Motion of Debtors' for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing Them to Enter Into and Perform Under Purchase Agreement, (II) Approving the Sale of the Designation Rights, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/8/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/7/2024. (Williamson, Erin) |
|
338 | 338
notice
Appearance - Notice
Wed 05/01 5:52 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Niki Main Street, LP. (Moldo, Byron) |
|
337 | 337
misc
Rule 2019 Statement - Attorney
Wed 05/01 5:51 PM
Rule 2019 Statement //Verified Statement Regarding Ad Hoc Group of Secured Noteholders Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2019 Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Secured Noteholders. (Haywood, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
336 | 336
order
Shorten Time
Wed 05/01 5:17 PM
ORDER SHORTENING NOTICE OF HEARING ON THE DEBTORS MOTION(I) AUTHORIZING THEM TO ENTER INTO AND PERFORM UNDER THEPURCHASE AGREEMENT, (II) APPROVING THE SALE OF THEDESIGNATION RIGHTS, AND (III) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF Order Signed on 5/1/2024. (AJL) |
|
335 | 335
order
Shorten Time
Wed 05/01 5:13 PM
ORDER SHORTENING THE NOTICE AND OBJECTION PERIODS WITHRESPECT TO THE MOTION OF AD HOC GROUP FOR ENTRY OF ANORDER (I) CONDITIONING THE USE, SALE, OR LEASE OF NOTESPRIORITY COLLATERAL ON THE PROVISION OF ADEQUATE PROTECTIONAS OF THE PETITION DATE AND (II) GRANTING RELATED RELIE Order Signed on 5/1/2024. (AJL) |
|
334 | 334
misc
Declaration in Support
Wed 05/01 5:06 PM
Supplemental Declaration in Support // Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey Finger in Support of the Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Jefferies LLC, as Investment Banker, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. (Williamson, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Schedule A | ||
333 | 333
misc
Declaration in Support
Wed 05/01 4:52 PM
Supplemental Declaration in Support // Supplemental Declaration of Robert J. Dehney, Sr., in Support of the Debtors Application for Entry of an Order Under 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(a), 328(a), and 1107(b), Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014 and 2016, and Del. Bankr. L.R. 2014-1 and 2016-1, Authorizing Retention and Employment of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP as Bankruptcy Co-Counsel for the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. (Dehney, Robert) |
|
332 | 332
order
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 05/01 4:32 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Nicholas Buchta Order Signed on 5/1/2024. (PS) |
|
331 | 331
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 05/01 4:31 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Assume or Assume and Assign Certain Unexpired Leases and Executory Contracts Effective as of April 30, 2024 and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. (Williamson, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
330 | 330
order
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 05/01 4:30 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of T. Daniel Reynolds Order Signed on 5/1/2024. (PS) |
|
329 | 329
order
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 05/01 4:29 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Heather Lennox Order Signed on 5/1/2024. (PS) |
|
328 | 328
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Wed 05/01 3:58 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Nicholas Buchta of Jones Day . Receipt Number 4397321, Filed by Dollar Tree, Inc.. (Shapiro, Zachary) |
|
327 | 327
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Wed 05/01 3:56 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of T. Daniel Reynolds of Jones Day . Receipt Number 4397321, Filed by Dollar Tree, Inc.. (Shapiro, Zachary) |
|
326 | 326
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Wed 05/01 3:52 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Heather Lennox of Jones Day . Receipt Number 4397321, Filed by Dollar Tree, Inc.. (Shapiro, Zachary) |
|
325 | 325
notice
Appearance - Notice
Wed 05/01 3:47 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Dollar Tree, Inc.. (Shapiro, Zachary) |
|
324 | 324
answer
Objection
Wed 05/01 11:25 AM
Objection to Rejection of a Lease Filed by Suri Westover Village, Inc. (MMD) |
|
323 | 323
notice
Appearance - Notice
Wed 05/01 11:20 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by J3 Generations, LLC. (MMD) |
|
322 | 322
misc
Declaration in Support
Wed 05/01 10:04 AM
Supplemental Declaration in Support // Second Supplemental Declaration of Ryan Lawlor in Support of Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Hilco Real Estate, LLC, as Real Estate Consultant and Advisor, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. (Williamson, Erin) |
|
321 | 321
crditcrd
none
Wed 05/01 9:48 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens([LINK 24-10719 JKS] ) [motion,msell] ( 199.00). Receipt Number A11570345, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
320 | 320
order
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 05/01 7:09 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Emma P. Myles Order Signed on 5/1/2024. (PS) |
|
319 | 319
order
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 05/01 7:08 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Craig E. Power Order Signed on 5/1/2024. (PS) |
|
318 | 318
order
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 05/01 7:06 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Reagan H. Gibbs, III Order Signed on 5/1/2024. (PS) |
|
317 | 317
order
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 05/01 7:05 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Robert J. Berens Order Signed on 5/1/2024. (PS) |
|
316 | 316
order
Appear pro hac vice
Wed 05/01 7:03 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of John M. Craig Order Signed on 5/1/2024. (PS) |
|
315 | 315
motion
Shorten - Motion
Wed 05/01 2:38 AM
Motion to Shorten Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Shortening Notice of Hearing on the Debtors' Motion for Entry of An Order (I) Authorizing Them to Enter Into and Perform Under Purchase Agreement, (II) Approving the Sale of the Designation Rights, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. (Weyand, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
314 | 314
misc
Declaration in Support
Wed 05/01 2:23 AM
Declaration in Support Declaration of Matt Tabloff in Support of the Debtors' Motion for Entry of An Order (I) Authorizing Them to Enter Into and Perform Under Purchase Agreement, (II) Approving the Sale of the Designation Rights, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. (Weyand, Jonathan) |
|
313 | 313
motion
Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens- Motion (FEE)
Wed 05/01 2:19 AM
Motion For Sale of Property Free and Clear of Liens(FEE) Debtors' Motion (I) Authorizing Them to Enter Into and Perform Under the Purchase Agreement, (II) Approving the Sale of the Designation Rights, and (III) Granting Related Relief Fee Amount $199 Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. (Weyand, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Sale Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Purchase Agreement | ||
312 | 312
motion
Shorten - Motion
Wed 05/01 12:19 AM
Motion to Shorten // Ad Hoc Group of Secured Note Holders Motion for Entry of an Order Shortening the Notice and Objection Periods with Respect to the Motion of Ad Hoc Group for Entry of an Order (I) Conditioning the Use, Sale, or Lease of Prepetition Collateral on the Provision of Adequate Protection as of the Petition Date and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Secured Noteholders. (Haywood, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
311 | 311
motion
Adequate Protection - Motion
Wed 05/01 12:07 AM
[SEALED] Motion for Adequate Protection // Motion of Ad Hoc Group for Entry of an Order (I) Conditioning the Use, Sale, or Lease of Prepetition Collateral on the Provision of Adequate Protection as of the Petition Date and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Secured Noteholders. (Haywood, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H | ||
misc
Add Attorney
Wed 05/01 3:50 PM
Attorney Emily Rae Mathews and Zachary I Shapiro for Dollar Tree, Inc., Gabrielle Colson and Zachary I Shapiro for Dollar Tree, Inc., Heather Lennox and Zachary I Shapiro for Dollar Tree, Inc., T. Daniel Reynolds and Zachary I Shapiro for Dollar Tree, Inc., Nicholas Buchta and Zachary I Shapiro for Dollar Tree, Inc. added to case Filed by Dollar Tree, Inc.. (Shapiro, Zachary) |
||
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
310 | 310
notice
Notice of Service
Tue 04/30 11:01 PM
Notice of Service // Ad Hoc Group of Secured Noteholders' Second Request for Production of Documents to the Debtors Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Secured Noteholders. (Haywood, Brett) |
|
309 | 309
notice
Rejection of Lease/Executory Contract - Notice
Tue 04/30 10:35 PM
Notice of Rejection of Lease/Executory Contract Amended Notice of Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts and/or Unexpired Leases (and Abandonment of Property Related Thereto) . Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. (Weyand, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Schedule 1 | ||
Att: 2 Schedule 2 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
308 | 308
notice
Rescheduled Hearing - Notice
Tue 04/30 9:59 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Hearing Originally Scheduled for 5/7/2024 at 11:00 A.M. has been rescheduled. Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/8/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Weyand, Jonathan) |
|
307 | 307
claims
Request for Service of Notices
Tue 04/30 7:19 PM
Request for Service of Notices. Filed by OP Crimson, LLC. (Moldo, Byron) |
|
306 | 306
motion
Allow - Motion
Tue 04/30 6:51 PM
Motion to Allow Motion of Dimare Fresh Inc. For Allowance of Administrative Expense Claim Pursuant to Section 503(b)(9) of The Bankruptcy Code Filed by DiMare Fresh Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/14/2024. (Joyce, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Att: 3 Notice | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
305 | 305
notice
Appearance - Notice
Tue 04/30 5:34 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by American National Insurance Company. (Annweiler, Tara) |
|
304 | 304
answer
Objection
Tue 04/30 4:06 PM
Objection to the Debtors' DIP Motion, Request for Adequate Protection, and Reservation of Rights of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee and Notes Collateral Agent for the 7.5000% Senior Secured Notes Due 2026 Filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Trustee for the 7.500% Senior Secured Notes due 2026 (Angelo, Jason) |
|
303 | 303
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Tue 04/30 3:56 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Emma P. Myles, Esq . Receipt Number 4396193, Filed by Shell Energy Solutions. (McDaniel, Garvan) |
|
302 | 302
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Tue 04/30 3:55 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Craig E. Power, Esq . Receipt Number 4396193, Filed by Shell Energy Solutions. (McDaniel, Garvan) |
|
301 | 301
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Tue 04/30 3:54 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Reagan H. Gibbs, III, Esq . Receipt Number 4396193, Filed by Shell Energy Solutions. (McDaniel, Garvan) |
|
300 | 300
answer
Objection
Tue 04/30 3:50 PM
[SEALED] Objection to the Debtors' DIP Motion, Request for Adequate Protection, and Reservation of Rights of The Ad Hoc Group of Secured Note Holders Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Secured Noteholders |
|
Att: 1 Schedule 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Intercreditor Agreement) | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B (Revised DIP Budget) | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C (April 19, 2024 Variance Report) | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D (Rough Transcript Excerpts of April 30, 2024 Deposition of Jeffrey Finger) | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E (Debtors' Responses and Objections to Rule 30(b(6) Notice)) (Haywood, Brett | ||
299 | 299
misc
Declaration in Support
Tue 04/30 3:35 PM
Supplemental Declaration in Support [First Supplemental Declaration of Joseph Malfitano in Support of Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Consulting Agreement, (II) Authorizing Store Closing Sales and Approving Related Procedures, (III) Authorizing Customary Compensation Enhancement, and (IV) Granting Certain Related Relief] Filed by Gordon Brothers Retail Partners, LLC. (Smillie, Heather) |
|
298 | 298
claims
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing
Tue 04/30 3:01 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Ishrat Khan Regarding Declaration of Joseph Malfitano in Support of Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Consulting Agreement; (II)Authorizing Store Closing Sales and Approving Related Procedures; (III) Authorizing Customary Bonuses; and (IV) Granting Certain Related Relief, and Declaration of Eric Kaup in Support of Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Consulting Agreement; (II) Authorizing Store Closing Sales and Approving Related Procedures; (III) Authorizing Customary Bonuses; and (IV) Granting Certain Related Relief . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (Malo, David) |
|
297 | 297
notice
Appearance - Notice
Tue 04/30 2:08 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Palmdale Investment Group, LLC. (MMD) |
|
296 | 296
notice
Withdrawal - Notice
Tue 04/30 10:59 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert J. Berens Filed by Harco National Insurance Company. (Pereira, Daniel) |
|
295 | 295
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Tue 04/30 10:46 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice re: John M. Craig, Esq . Receipt Number 4348896, Filed by Arizona Public Service Company, San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Southern California Edison Company, Tucson Electric Power Company, UNS Electric, Inc.. (Taylor, William) |
|
294 | 294
misc
Verified Statement
Tue 04/30 10:43 AM
Verified Statement Filed by Arizona Public Service Company, Salt River Project, San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Southern California Edison Company, Tucson Electric Power Company. (Taylor, William) |
|
293 | 293
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 04/30 7:22 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Khaled Tarazi Order Signed on 4/30/2024. (PS) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
292 | 292
notice
Rejection of Lease/Executory Contract - Notice
Mon 04/29 10:43 PM
Notice of Rejection of Lease/Executory Contract (and Abandonment of Property Related Thereto) . Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. (Weyand, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Schedule 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
291 | 291
notice
Rejection of Lease/Executory Contract - Notice
Mon 04/29 10:41 PM
Notice of Rejection of Lease/Executory Contract (and Abandonment of Property Related Thereto) . Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. (Weyand, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Schedule 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
290 | 290
notice
Rejection of Lease/Executory Contract - Notice
Mon 04/29 10:39 PM
Notice of Rejection of Lease/Executory Contract (and Abandonment of Property Related Thereto) . Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. (Weyand, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Schedule 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
289 | 289
misc
Joinder (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 3:36 PM
Joinder of 3365 Lavco, LLC to Landlord Limited Objections Filed by 3365 Lavco LLC, and certain of its affiliates. (Powell, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
288 | 288
court
Omnibus Hearing Dates
Mon 04/29 3:33 PM
Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing for 5/23/2024 at 10:00 AM US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Signed on 4/29/2024. (PS) |
|
287 | 287
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 04/29 3:32 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice (Khaled Tarazi, Esquire) . Receipt Number 24-10719 Filed by 3365 Lavco LLC, and certain of its affiliates. (Powell, Jason) |
|
286 | 286
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Mon 04/29 3:21 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. (Talmo, Matthew) |
|
285 | 285
notice
Appearance - Notice
Mon 04/29 2:26 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Goodwill of Central and Northern Arizona. (Keenan, Benjamin) |
|
284 | 284
notice
Appearance - Notice
Mon 04/29 1:58 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Oracle Limberlost Shopping Center, LLC. (Keenan, Benjamin) |
|
283 | 283
claims
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing
Mon 04/29 11:28 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of James Roy Regarding Notice of Hearing Scheduled for April 10, 2024, at 12:00 P.M. (Eastern Time), Amended Notice Adjourning Hearing Originally Scheduled for April 10, 2024, at 12:00 P.M. (Eastern Time) to 1:00 P.M. (Eastern Time), and Second Amended Notice Adjourning Hearing Originally Scheduled for April 10, 2024, at 12:00 P.M. (Eastern Time) to 1:30 P.M. (Eastern Time) . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (Malo, David) |
|
282 | 282
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 04/29 11:15 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice Order Signed on 4/29/2024. (AJL) |
|
281 | 281
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 04/29 11:14 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice Order Signed on 4/29/2024. (AJL) |
|
280 | 280
1
pgs
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 04/29 11:04 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Robert J. Feinstein . Receipt Number 4394676, Filed by Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Robinson, Colin) |
|
279 | 279
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 04/29 10:51 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Maxim B. Litvak . Receipt Number ADEC-43517, Filed by Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Golden, Steven) |
|
278 | 278
notice
Appearance - Notice
Mon 04/29 9:58 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Sandler, Bradford) |
|
misc
Add Attorney
Mon 04/29 1:59 PM
Attorney Adam B. Nach and Benjamin W. Keenan for Oracle Limberlost Shopping Center, LLC, Paul M Hilkert and Benjamin W. Keenan for Oracle Limberlost Shopping Center, LLC added to case Filed by Oracle Limberlost Shopping Center, LLC. (Keenan, Benjamin) |
||
misc
Add Attorney
Mon 04/29 2:27 PM
Attorney Adam B. Nach and Benjamin W. Keenan for Goodwill of Central and Northern Arizona, Paul M Hilkert and Benjamin W. Keenan for Goodwill of Central and Northern Arizona added to case Filed by Goodwill of Central and Northern Arizona. (Keenan, Benjamin) |
||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
277 | 277
notice
Reclamation of Claim - Notice
Fri 04/26 6:52 PM
Notice of Reclamation of Claim Filed by Allied West Paper Corp.. (Russell, John) |
|
276 | 276
answer
Objection
Fri 04/26 5:52 PM
Limited Objection to Debtors' DIP Motion and Joinder to Objection of Similarly Situated Landlords Filed by Kimco Realty Corporation (Mersky, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
275 | 275
order
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 04/26 4:43 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice Order Signed on 4/26/2024. (AJL) |
|
274 | 274
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Fri 04/26 4:28 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice . Receipt Number 4394073, Filed by Yacoel 2021 Partners, LP. (Williams, Jordan) |
|
273 | 273
answer
Objection
Fri 04/26 3:10 PM
Limited Objection and Reservation of Rights of 31033 Date Plam LLC to Notice of Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts and/or Unexpired Leases (And Abandonment of Property Related Thereto) Filed by 31033 Date Palm LLC (Weaver, John) |
|
272 | 272
notice
Notice of Service
Fri 04/26 2:49 PM
Notice of Service Notice of Filing Exhibit A to Limited Objection and Reservation of Rights of KTR CLA II LLC to Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Consulting Agreement, (II) Authorizing Store Closing Sales and Approving Related Procedures, (III) Authorizing Customary Compensation Enhancement, and (IV) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by KTR CLA II LLC. (Bambrick, Ian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
271 | 271
answer
Objection
Fri 04/26 2:39 PM
Joint Objection to the Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Consulting Agreement, (II) Authorizing Store Closing Sales and Approving Related Procedures, (III) Authorizing Customary Compensation Enhancement, and (IV) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Texas Tax Authorities (Grundemeier, Tara) |
|
270 | 270
notice
Notice of Service
Fri 04/26 2:21 PM
Notice of Service of Ad Hoc Group of Secured Noteholders' Notice of Deposition of Jeffrey Finger Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(1) Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Secured Noteholders. (Haywood, Brett) |
|
269 | 269
answer
Objection
Fri 04/26 2:18 PM
Objection Limited Objection and Reservation of Rights of KTR CLA II LLC to Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Consulting Agreement, (II) Authorizing Store Closing Sales and Approving Related Procedures, (III) Authorizing Customary Compensation Enhancement, and (IV) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by KTR CLA II LLC (Bambrick, Ian) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
268 | 268
claims
Reclamation of Claim - Notice
Fri 04/26 2:14 PM
Notice of Reclamation of Claim. Filed by Golden Lyon Investment Co., d/b/a W.Y. International Inc.. (Carbino, Jeffrey) |
|
267 | 267
answer
Objection
Fri 04/26 1:40 PM
Limited Objection of Yacoel 2021 Partners, LP to Rejection of Lease and Facilities Management Agreement Filed by Yacoel 2021 Partners, LP (Williams, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
266 | 266
order
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 04/26 1:25 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice Order Signed on 4/26/2024. (AJL) |
|
265 | 265
claims
Reclamation of Claim - Notice
Fri 04/26 1:16 PM
Notice of Reclamation of Claim. Filed by Powermax Battery (U.S.A.) Inc.. (Thomas, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
264 | 264
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Fri 04/26 11:39 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Joseph H. Lemkin . Receipt Number 4393591, Filed by Conopco, Inc. dba Unilever United States. (Weaver, John) |
|
263 | 263
answer
Objection
Fri 04/26 11:33 AM
Limited Objection of Kin Properties, Inc. and Certain Affiliated Landlords to Debtors' Motion for Entry of a Final Order (I) Authorizing and Approving Procedures for Rejection and Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, (II) Authorizing Abandonment of Certain Personal Property, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Kin Properties, Inc., Esther Jeffrey LLC and Jefan LLC (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
262 | 262
notice
Appearance - Notice
Fri 04/26 11:22 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Shell Energy Solutions. (McDaniel, Garvan) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
261 | 261
notice
Reclamation of Claim - Notice
Fri 04/26 10:54 AM
Notice of Reclamation of Claim Filed by Dole Packaged Food, LLC. (Allinson, III, Elihu) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
260 | 260
claims
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing
Fri 04/26 9:57 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Eladio Perez Regarding Notice of Interim Order Establishing Notice and Hearing Procedures for Trading Equity Securities in the Debtors and Setting Record Date for Notice and Sell-Down Procedures . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (Malo, David) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
259 | 259
misc
Declaration in Support
Thu 04/25 9:44 PM
Supplemental Declaration in Support // First Supplemental Declaration of Ryan Lawlor in Support of Debtors Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Hilco Real Estate, LLC, as Real Estate Consultant and Advisor, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. (Talmo, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Schedule 1 | ||
258 | 258
claims
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing
Thu 04/25 5:04 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Victor Wong Regarding Debtors Application for Approval of Retention of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC to (I) Provide the Debtors with a Chief Restructuring Officer and Certain Additional Personnel and (II) Designate Christopher J. Wells as Chief Restructuring Officer for the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, Debtors Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing Employment and Retention of Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC as Administrative Advisor Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, Debtors Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Milbank LLP as Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, Debtors Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Hilco Real Estate, LLC, as Real Estate Consultant and Advisor, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Them to Retain and Compensate Certain Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business, Effective as of the Petition Date, Debtors Application for Entry of an Order Under 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(a), 328(a), and 1107(b), Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014 and 2016, and Del. Bankr. l.r. 2014- 1 and 2016-1, Authorizing Retention and Employment of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP as Bankruptcy CO-Counsel for the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, Debtors Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Jefferies LLC, as Investment Banker, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, and Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order Approving (I) (A) Bidding Procedures in Connection With the Sale of Substantially All of the Debtors Remaining Assets, (B) Assumption and Assignment Procedures, (C) Form and Manner of Notice of Sale Hearing, Assumption Procedures, and Auction Results; (II) Auction and Sale Hearing Dates; (III) (A) Debtors Entry Into One or Multiple Asset Purchase Agreements, (B) Sale(s) Free and Clear of All Encumbrances, and (C) Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases; and (IV) Granting Related Relief . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. (Malo, David) |
|
257 | 257
misc
Declaration in Support
Thu 04/25 4:51 PM
Supplemental Declaration in Support [First Supplemental Declaration of Eric Kaup in Support of Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Consulting Agreement, (II) Authorizing Store Closing Sales and Approving Related Procedures, (III) Authorizing Customary Compensation Enhancement, and (IV) Granting Certain Related Relief] Filed by Hilco Merchant Resources, LLC. (Smillie, Heather) |
|
256 | 256
misc
Joinder (Attorney)
Thu 04/25 4:10 PM
Joinder of Moniem and Maria Shaaban to Landlord Objections to Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Them to (A) Obtain Postpetition Financing and (B) Utilize Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing, (V) Granting Adequate Protection, and (Vi) Granting Related Relief Filed by Mr. &Mrs. Moniem Shaaban. (Joyce, Michael) |
|
255 | 255
notice
Appearance - Notice
Thu 04/25 3:38 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Ciuti International. (Capuzzi, Kevin) |
|
254 | 254
notice
Deposition - Notice
Thu 04/25 3:38 PM
Amended Notice of Deposition // Ad Hoc Group of Secured Noteholders' Amended Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6) Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Secured Noteholders. (Haywood, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
253 | 253
notice
Hearing - Notice
Thu 04/25 3:32 PM
Notice of Hearing // Notice of Sale, Bidding Procedures, Auction, and Sale Hearing Filed by Number Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2024 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Williamson, Erin) |
|
252 | 252
misc
Joinder (Attorney)
Thu 04/25 3:15 PM
Joinder to Landlord Objections to Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Them to (A) Obtain Postpetition Financing and (B) Utilize Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (IV) Scheduling a Final Hearing, (V) Granting Adequate Protection, and (VI) Granting Related Relief Filed by Kent Holding LLC. (Demmy, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Lease | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
251 | 251
misc
Request for Service of Notices
Thu 04/25 2:56 PM
Request for Service of Notices Filed by RCB Equities #1, LLC. (Aron, Simon) |
|
250 | 250
notice
Appearance - Notice
Thu 04/25 2:07 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Nissin Foods (USA) Co., Inc.. (Debitetto, Rocco) |
|
249 | 249
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/25 1:41 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Royal Bank of Canada. (Morton, Edmon) |
|
248 | 248
notice
Appearance - Notice
Thu 04/25 12:54 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by 99SD Holdings LLC. (Busenkell, Michael) |
|
247 | 247
notice
Appearance - Notice
Thu 04/25 9:34 AM
Amended Notice of Appearance. Filed by Harris County ESD #25, Harris County ESD #20, Harris County ESD #01, Lone Star College System, City of Pasadena, City of Humble, Harris County ESD #09, Harris County ESD #48, Houston ISD, Houston Community College System, City of Houston, Harris County ESD #11, Harris County ESD #12, Harris County ID #46, Harris County ESD #29, Katy ISD. (Grundemeier, Tara) |
|
246 | 246
order
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 04/25 7:38 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Scott A. Zuber of CHIESA Shahinian & Giantomasi PC Order Signed on 4/25/2024. (PS) |
|
misc
Add Attorney
Thu 04/25 12:55 PM
Attorney Robert W. Blanchard and Michael G. Busenkell for 99SD Holdings LLC added to case Filed by 99SD Holdings LLC. (Busenkell, Michael) |
||
misc
Add Attorney
Thu 04/25 3:40 PM
Attorney John C Gentile and Kevin M. Capuzzi for Ciuti International, Juan E Martinez and Kevin M. Capuzzi for Ciuti International added to case Filed by Ciuti International. (Capuzzi, Kevin) |