McKendrick v. Social Security, Commissioner of
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Curtis Ivy, Jr |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-10983 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/08/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Appearance
Fri 04/26 8:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Ridgell-Boltz on behalf of Social Security, Commissioner of. (Ridgell-Boltz, Laura) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Attorney Appearance
Wed 04/17 3:53 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eddy Pierre Pierre appearing on behalf of Jeffrey McKendrick (Pierre Pierre, Eddy) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Attorney Appearance
Wed 04/17 11:03 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wesley James Lamey appearing on behalf of Jeffrey McKendrick (Lamey, Wesley) |
|
notice
Error
Wed 04/17 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Wesley James Lamey re4 Attorney Appearance. Other Attorney Appearance document is on behalf of someone else. Attorney's must file appearances on their own behalf.. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (JPar) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Tue 04/16 3:32 PM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (SKra) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Attorney Appearance
Tue 04/16 1:55 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wesley James Lamey appearing on behalf of Jeffrey McKendrick (Lamey, Wesley) |
|
notice
Notice of New SSA Case Filing
Tue 04/16 1:16 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of New Case Filing to Social Security Administration's Office of the General Counsel and the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Michigan. (JPar) |
||
notice
Error
Tue 04/16 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Wesley James Lamey re3 Attorney Appearance. Other Attorney's must file appearances on their own behalf. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (JPar) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/15 3:22 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wesley James Lamey appearing on behalf of Jeffrey McKendrick (Lamey, Wesley) |
|
2 | 2
petition
Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Mon 04/15 3:17 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Jeffrey McKendrick. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Mon 04/15 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Jeffrey McKendrick against Commissioner of Social Security. No summons requested. IFP Application to Follow. County of 1st Plaintiff: Livingston - County Where Action Arose: Livingston - County of 1st Defendant: Unknown. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Pierre Pierre, Eddy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit civil cover |