Hunter v. Cunningham et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Terrence G Berg |
Referred: | David R Grand |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-10989 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Cunningham
|
|
Defendant
Felver
|
|
Defendant
Gaskill
|
|
Defendant
Vanderheuvel
|
|
Plaintiff
Theron Hunter
1005 Barton Drive
Ann Arbor, MI 48105 |
Docket last updated: 05/08/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 04/24 3:32 PM
Case transferred from Michigan Eastern has been opened in Western District of Michigan as case 1:24-cv-00415, filed 04/24/2024. (VLun) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Tue 04/23 2:56 PM
Case transferred to Western District of Michigan. (VLun) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Transferring Case to Western District of Michigan
Tue 04/23 2:28 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (DAll) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*
Thu 04/18 10:18 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LGra) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
petition
Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Tue 04/16 8:27 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Theron Hunter. [Pro Se Upload] (TTho) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Tue 04/16 8:27 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Theron Hunter against All Defendants [Pro Se Upload] (TTho) |