Seeley (PS) v. County of Denver et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Prose |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01013 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 05/14 9:02 AM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 110593 (cmadr, ) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
Tue 05/14 8:55 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 13 May 2024. Plaintiff's "Motion for Leave Amendment or Supplementation" (ECF No.7 ) is denied without prejudice. On April 17, 2024, Plaintiff was ordered to pay the filing fee in this case within thirty days. (ECF No.4 ). Plaintiff may not proceed further in this case until he pays the filing fee. If Plaintiff pays the filing fee within the time allowed he may then re-file his motion to amend.(cmadr, ) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Amend/Correct/Modify
Fri 05/10 3:08 PM
MOTION for Leave Amendment or Supplantation by Motion Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(b)(1), by Plaintiff Clarence Wayne Seeley, III. (angar, ) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Appointing Counsel
Thu 05/02 4:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No.5 ) is denied without prejudice as premature because this case is under initial review. Plaintiff may renew his request for counsel by filing, on the court-approved form, a Prisoner Motion for Appointment of Counsel if the case is later drawn to a presiding judge under Local Rule 8.1(c), by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 5/2/2024.(angar, ) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 04/26 2:47 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Clarence Wayne Seeley, III. (sphil, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/18 11:40 AM
ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1915. The Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (ECF No.2 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff shall pay the full amount of $405.00 ($350.00 filing fee, plus a $55.00 administrative fee) within thirty (30) days from the date of this order if Plaintiff wishes to pursue any claims in this action. If Plaintiff fails to pay the full amount of $405.00 within the time allowed, the complaint and action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/17/2024.(ccuen, ) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 04/16 1:59 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 1:58 PM
Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Clarence Wayne Seeley, III. (efoga, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 1:55 PM
PRISONER COMPLAINT against City of Denver, County of Denver, Idris Chambers, State of Colorado, filed by Clarence Wayne Seeley, III.(efoga, ) |