Mohamed v. United States Department of State et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Nina Y Wang |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01022 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 2:42 AM MDT |
Defendant
Antony Blinken
|
|
Defendant
Ervin Massinga
|
|
Defendant
U.S. Embassy in Addis Ababa, Ethiopia
|
|
Defendant
United States Department of State
|
|
Plaintiff
Fuad Dayib Mohamed
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 05/15 2:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER IT IS ORDERED that the clerk shall assign this case to judicialofficers under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/15/2024. This case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Starnella for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-01022-NYW. (norlin, ) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed as to USA - Complaint
Thu 04/25 6:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Antony Blinken served on 4/24/2024, answer due 6/24/2024; Ervin Massinga served on 4/24/2024, answer due 6/24/2024; U.S. Embassy in Addis Ababa, Ethiopia served on 4/24/2024, answer due 6/24/2024; United States Department of State served on 4/24/2024, answer due 6/24/2024.(Hacking, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified mail receipts | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 2:59 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (efoga, ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Wed 04/17 2:51 PM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Summons Request
Tue 04/16 6:11 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to United States Department of State; U.S. Embassy in Addis Ababa, Ethiopia; Antony Blinken; Ervin Massinga re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Fuad Dayib Mohamed.(Hacking, James) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Summons Attorney General, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons Blinken, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons DOS, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Summons Embassy, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Summons U.S Attorney | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/16 5:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Antony Blinken, Ervin Massinga, U.S. Embassy in Addis Ababa, Ethiopia, United States Department of State (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9640927)Attorney James O. Hacking, III added to party Fuad Dayib Mohamed(pty:pla), filed by Fuad Dayib Mohamed.(Hacking, James) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |