Sander v. Sanofi U.S.
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Gordon P Gallagher |
Referred: | Maritza Dominguez Braswell |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01034 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 17, 2024 5:08 PM MDT |
Defendant
Sanofi U.S.
|
|
Plaintiff
Brenda Sander
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/26 12:50 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/12/2024. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/26/2024. (evaug) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/18 10:11 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other specifically-referred motions, and (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-1034-GPG-MDB Text Only Entry (angar, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 9:05 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (bcroc, ) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Thu 04/18 8:54 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Gordon P Gallagher and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry (bcroc, ) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/17 2:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Sanofi U.S. (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9642348)Attorney Katherine I. Hartley added to party Brenda Sander(pty:pla), filed by Brenda Sander.(Hartley, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |