Bowman v. Tanner
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brandy R Mcmillion |
Referred: | Kimberly G Altman |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-10993 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/08/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 04/30 1:38 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Antoine E. Bowman (SSch) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*
Fri 04/19 8:58 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LGra) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Requiring Responsive Pleading*
Wed 04/17 4:24 PM
ORDER Requiring Response to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Attached Petition has been electronically served on the Michigan Attorney General and the Michigan Department of Corrections. Response due by 10/24/2024 Reply due by 12/9/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JHea) |
|
Att: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Wed 04/17 4:22 PM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JHea) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
petition
Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Wed 04/17 11:14 AM
APPLICATION [Motion] to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Antoine E. Bowman. (MCho) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 04/17 11:12 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Antoine E. Bowman against Jeff Tanner. (MCho) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |