12
|
|
12
service
Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day
Tue 04/30 8:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Schubert, Amber)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Tue 04/30 2:36 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Onstar, LLC (Douglas, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Tue 04/30 2:35 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by General Motors LLC (Douglas, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
notice
Appearance
Tue 04/30 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Douglas on behalf of General Motors LLC, Onstar, LLC. (Douglas, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
service
Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day
Mon 04/29 8:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Onstar, LLC waiver sent on 4/29/2024, answer due 6/28/2024. (Schubert, Amber)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day
Mon 04/29 8:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. General Motors LLC waiver sent on 4/29/2024, answer due 6/28/2024. (Schubert, Amber)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Fri 04/26 2:11 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent RELX PLC, Other Affiliate LexisNexis Risk Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate RELX Inc., Other Affiliate RELX Group plc, Other Affiliate RELX Overseas Holdings Limited for LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.. (Lund, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
notice
Appearance
Fri 04/26 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Lund on behalf of LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.. (Lund, Matthew)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
notice
Appearance
Thu 04/18 9:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Love Schubert on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Schubert, Amber)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Summons Issued*
Wed 04/17 4:27 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *General Motors LLC, LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc., Onstar, LLC* (JPar)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
service
Summons Issued*
Wed 04/17 1:17 PM
[DOCKETING ERROR] SUMMONS Issued for *General Motors LLC, LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc., Onstar, LLC* (JPar) Modified on 4/17/2024 (JPar).
Related: [-]
|
|
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Wed 04/17 1:20 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (JPar)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9754032 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Placer County - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Johnston, Rod)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit Exhibit 1 - CLRA Venue Affidavit
|