Shaver v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Michael E Hegarty |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01043 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Denver County District Court, 2024CV30885 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 2:07 PM MDT |
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lance Shaver
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Fri 04/26 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Michael Dormer on behalf of Lance ShaverAttorney Sean Michael Dormer added to party Lance Shaver(pty:pla) (Dormer, Sean) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Fri 04/26 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica M. Mauser on behalf of Lance ShaverAttorney Jessica M. Mauser added to party Lance Shaver(pty:pla) (Mauser, Jessica) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/25 2:29 PM
Defendant ANSWER to4 Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Salg, Heather) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2
Wed 04/24 8:56 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:9 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Jean M. Peterson, and Heather A. Salg. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (dgumb, ) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Tue 04/23 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Heather A. Salg on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Salg, Heather) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Minute Order
Fri 04/19 2:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The above captioned case has been directly assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. Magistrate Consent Form due 5/21/2024 . Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/21/2024 . Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2024 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/19/2024. (dgumb, ) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Thu 04/18 4:41 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, ) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Thu 04/18 4:41 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
5 | 5
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint
Thu 04/18 4:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Cover Sheet, Complaint, and Summons upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 3/29/2024 (efoga, ) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/18 4:39 PM
COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Lance Shaver.(efoga, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
Thu 04/18 4:39 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/18 1:20 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Salg, Heather) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/18 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Denver County, Case Number 2024CV030885. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9643940), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Salg, Heather) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Return of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Voter Registration, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Restated Articles of Incorporation for State Farm, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit ROA & Pleadings, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet USDC, | ||
Att: 9 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet USDC |