E&K, LLC v. Littelfuse, Inc.
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark A Goldsmith |
Referred: | Kimberly G Altman |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11045 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Oakland County Circuit Court, 24-206304-CB |
Last checked: Friday Apr 19, 2024 4:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Littelfuse, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
E&K, LLC
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Mon 05/06 3:21 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs (Bone, Devin) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Discovery Plan - Rule 26f
Mon 05/06 3:16 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Bone, Devin) Modified on 5/6/2024 (JHea) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Correction
Wed 05/01 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Correction re8 Order. (KSan) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 05/01 11:29 AM
[STRICKEN] ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference., ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 5/16/2024 04:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith ) Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call, and then include the Court by calling (313) 234-5240 when all parties are on the line. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (MNee) Modified on 5/1/2024 (KSan) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Tue 04/30 1:32 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Littelfuse, Inc. (Brady, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 04/29 2:20 PM
ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2024 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith ). Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call, and then include the Court by calling (313) 234-5240 when all parties are on the line. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 2:19 PM
ORDER Regarding Protocols on Filings and Communication with the Court. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 2:18 PM
ORDER Regarding Removal. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint Civil Case - Counterclaim
Fri 04/26 4:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Littelfuse, Inc. against E&K, LLC by Littelfuse, Inc.. (Brady, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Terms and Conditions | ||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 04/22 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley E. Racette on behalf of Littelfuse, Inc.. (Racette, Ashley) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Mon 04/22 8:25 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (TTho) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Notice of Removal
Fri 04/19 3:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Littelfuse, Inc. from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2024-206304-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9759414 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Brady, Michael) |