Jones v. Campbell et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Judith E Levy |
Referred: | Anthony P Patti |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-11028 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/08/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/06 9:22 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re5 Order Staying Case on Ronald E. Jones Pris. No. 276531 at GUS HARRISON CORRECTIONAL FACILITY 2727 E. BEECHER STREET, ADRIAN, MI 49221. (WBar) |
||
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Staying Case
Fri 05/03 4:02 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Fri 05/03 1:07 PM
ORDER granting Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $13.20 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JHea) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Mediation Program*
Fri 04/19 9:01 AM
NOTICE of Mediation Program (JHea) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Fri 04/19 8:59 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Ronald E. Jones (JHea) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Fri 04/19 8:58 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Ronald E. Jones against J. Bush, S. Campbell (JHea) |
|
Att: 1 Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |