Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan K Declercq |
Referred: | Curtis Ivy, Jr |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11071 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 2:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion - Free
Tue 04/30 2:59 PM
ORDER Granting4 Leave to Serve Early Subpoena. Signed by District Judge Susan K. DeClercq. (LVer) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion - Free
Mon 04/29 5:42 PM
MOTION by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Stalzer Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Williamson Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Paige Declaration | ||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Tue 04/23 1:31 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Patent/Copyright/Trademark Report
Tue 04/23 1:30 PM
Copyright Report Sent To Washington (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits A | ||
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Tue 04/23 1:29 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC against John Doe with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9763012 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A |