Reid (PS) v. Ciolli et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Scott T Varholak |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01114 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241fd - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Mon 05/13 2:52 PM
LETTER by Petitioner Richard Reid. (dgumb, ) |
|
14 | 14
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 05/13 11:08 AM
RESPONSE to12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Stating No Opposition filed by Respondents A. Ciolli, English, A. Matevousian, C. Peters. (Scarpato, Victor) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Appendix
Fri 05/10 2:29 PM
Supplimentary [sic] APPENDIX by Petitioner Richard Reid. (dgumb, ) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 05/10 2:28 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Richard Reid. (dgumb, ) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint
Fri 05/03 3:30 PM
USPS Certified Mail Receipt Return of8 Certificate of Service upon United States Attorney's Office served on 5/1/2024. (dgumb, ) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Fri 05/03 10:10 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Victor William Scarpato, III on behalf of A. Ciolli, English, A. Matevousian, C. PetersAttorney Victor William Scarpato, III added to party A. Ciolli(pty:res), Attorney Victor William Scarpato, III added to party English(pty:res), Attorney Victor William Scarpato, III added to party A. Matevousian(pty:res), Attorney Victor William Scarpato, III added to party C. Peters(pty:res) (Scarpato, Victor) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint
Mon 04/29 8:51 AM
Acknowledgment of Service upon George Sanchez. (dgumb, ) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/26 4:00 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re7 ORDER TO FILE PRELIMINARY RESPONSE, and1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 for Service of Process. (dgumb, ) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/26 2:16 PM
ORDER TO FILE PRELIMINARY RESPONSE. It is ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order Respondents shall file a Preliminary Response that complies with this Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of the filing of the Preliminary Response Applicant may file a Reply, if he desires. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Respondents do not intend to raise the affirmative defense of exhaustion of administrative remedies, Respondents must notify the Court of that decision in the Preliminary Response, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/26/2024. (dgumb, ) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/26 11:04 AM
ORDER granting3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/26/2024.(dgumb, ) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter Reassigning Case
Thu 04/25 2:03 PM
CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to4 Order of Recusal. This case is directly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-1114-STV . (Text Only Entry) (dgumb, ) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Thu 04/25 1:59 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. IT IS ORDERED that: (1) I recuse myself from further service in this matter; and (2) The Clerk of the Court shall cause this case to be reassigned, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 4/25/2024. (dgumb, ) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/23 12:53 PM
Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action by Petitioner Richard Reid. (agarc, ) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 04/23 12:52 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (agarc, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 04/23 12:45 PM
APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Richard Reid.(agarc, ) |