Tolliver (PS) v. Michelle et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Prose |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01122 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 2:05 AM MDT |
Defendant
Jhon Jackson
|
|
Defendant
Kylie Jenner
|
|
Defendant
Kim Kardashian
|
|
Defendant
Karira
|
|
Defendant
Keisha Knight
|
|
Defendant
Beyonce Knowells
|
|
Defendant
Andraya Michelle
|
|
Defendant
Abury Oday
|
|
Defendant
Angela Simmons
|
|
Plaintiff
Kamilah Tolliver
3601 South Dallas Street
Denver, CO 80231 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 05/01 3:31 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re:1 Complaint and 2 Case Assigned to Judge, Addressed to Kamilah Tolliver. (ccuen, ) |
|
3 | 3
6
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/01 9:38 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES AND AMEND COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 05/01/2024. It is ORDERED that within thirty days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint that complies with the directives in this order and that cures the designated deficiencies. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. It isFURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall obtain the Court-approved Complaint formand Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov, and use the forms to cure the above noted deficiencies. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, this action will be dismissed without further notice. (jrobe, ) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Tue 04/23 3:25 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/23 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Jhon Jackson, Kylie Jenner, Kim Kardashian, Karira, Keisha Knight, Beyonce Knowells, Andraya Michelle, Abury Oday, Angela Simmons, filed by Kamilah Tolliver.(efoga, ) |