McMordie v. Sam's East, Inc et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen J Murphy, III |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Stafford |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11086 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Jackson County Circuit Court, 24-00667-NO |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Sam's East, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Stores, Inc d/b/a Sam's Club
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca McMordie
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
8
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/30 3:46 PM
ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference ( Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2024 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 04/24 1:52 PM
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Reliance on Jury Demand (Stearn, Todd) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Wed 04/24 12:50 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Jannette, Ellen) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/24 12:44 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Jannette, Ellen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Notice of Removal
Wed 04/24 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Jackson County Circuit Court, case number 24-0667 NO. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9765292 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Jannette, Ellen) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Service |