Ajigbotafe v. Walton
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Michael E Hegarty |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01151 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 25, 2024 11:10 AM MDT |
Defendant
Harmony Walton
|
|
Plaintiff
Olufemi Ajigbotafe
391 Mira Loma Lane
Escondido, CA 92025 |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Mailing/Service
Fri 04/26 11:55 AM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing re4 Minute Order. Mailed to Olufemi Ajigbotafe 391 Mira Loma Lane Escondido, CA 92025 (dgumb, ) |
|
4 | 4
order
Minute Order
Fri 04/26 11:53 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Magistrate Consent Form due 7/1/2024 . Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/1/2024 . Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2024 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/26/2024. (dgumb, ) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Thu 04/25 1:26 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Thu 04/25 1:25 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/25 1:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Harmony Walton (Filing Fee: $405.00, Receipt Number: 110407), filed by Olufemi Ajigbotafe. (blaws) Modified on 4/25/2024 to attach additional received documents. (blaws) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Warranty Deed, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Settlement Statement, | ||
Att: 3 District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 District Court Civil Summons |