Lima v. General Motors LLC et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gershwin A Drain |
Referred: | Curtis Ivy, Jr |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11119 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 26, 2024 5:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
General Motors LLC
|
|
Defendant
LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Onstar LLC
|
|
Defendant
Verisk Analytics, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
David Lima
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Fri 05/03 11:54 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc. identifying Corporate Parent RELX PLC, Other Affiliate LexisNexis Risk Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate RELX Inc., Other Affiliate RELX Group plc, Other Affiliate RELX Overseas Holdings Limited for LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc.. (Lund, Matthew) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Appearance
Fri 05/03 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Lund on behalf of LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc.. (Lund, Matthew) |
|
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day
Fri 05/03 11:31 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 5/2/2024, answer due 7/1/2024. (Hughes, Emily) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day
Tue 04/30 2:55 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Onstar LLC waiver sent on 4/29/2024, answer due 6/28/2024. (Hughes, Emily) |
|
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day
Tue 04/30 2:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. General Motors LLC waiver sent on 4/29/2024, answer due 6/28/2024. (Hughes, Emily) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Tue 04/30 2:39 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Onstar LLC (Douglas, Stephanie) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
Tue 04/30 2:38 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by General Motors LLC, Onstar LLC (Douglas, Stephanie) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Appearance
Tue 04/30 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Douglas on behalf of General Motors LLC, Onstar LLC. (Douglas, Stephanie) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/29 12:10 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Emily E. Hughes appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hughes, Emily) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued*
Mon 04/29 9:03 AM
SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DPer) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Mon 04/29 9:03 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DPer) |
||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
23
pgs
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Fri 04/26 4:36 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint Jury Trial Demanded filed by David Lima against General Motors LLC, LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc., Onstar LLC, Verisk Analytics, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9769238 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): USDC Eastern District of Michigan, 24-10804 24-10824 24-11062 Judge Hon. Jonathan J.C. Grey ] (Miller, E.) |