Crocs, Inc. v. Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel D Domenico |
Referred: | N Reid Neureiter |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01167 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 26, 2024 5:06 PM MDT |
Defendant
Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
|
|
Plaintiff
Crocs, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 05/15 2:16 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 5/15/2024. Text Only Entry. (rkeec) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 05/15 1:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk shall assign this case to judicial officers under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/15/2024. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-01167-DDD . (schap, ) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons Issued
Mon 04/29 9:34 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (blaws) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/29 6:56 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Banias, Bradley) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Mon 04/29 9:24 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (blaws) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/26 3:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9658952)Attorney Bradley B. Banias added to party Crocs, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Crocs, Inc..(Banias, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons |