Water and Sanitation Health, Inc. v. Rainforest Alliance, Inc
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard A Jones |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00075 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 15, 2015 6:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
Rainforest Alliance, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rainforest Alliance Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Water and Sanitation Health, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Water and Sanitation Health Inc
a non-profit organization registered in the State of Washington Eric J. Harrison 111 - 1st Avenue South Suite 306
Seattle, WA 98104 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 08/05 3:01 PM
This case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party pursuant to the parties'39 Stipulation of Dismissal and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). No court order is necessary. (VE) |
||
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
3
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Wed 08/03 4:46 PM
STIPULATION For Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice and Without Costs to Either Party by parties (Elkanich, David) |
|
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
4
pgs
order
RAJ Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates
Mon 03/14 1:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING AMENDED TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 5 days. The court has considered the parties'37 Stipulation Regarding Case Scheduling Order and resets the trial date and pretrial deadlines in this matter as follows: JURY TRIAL is reset for 2/6/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 4/6/2016, Amended Pleadings due by 8/10/2016, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/10/2016, Discovery completed by 10/11/2016, Dispositive motions due by 11/8/2016, Motions in Limine due by 1/9/2017, Pretrial Order due by 1/23/2017, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 1/30/2017, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
5
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Fri 03/11 4:54 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER regarding Case Scheduling Order by parties (Marshall, Toby) |
|
36 | 36
10
pgs
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 03/11 2:53 PM
ANSWER to34 Amended Complaint by Rainforest Alliance Inc.(Elkanich, David) |
|
Tuesday, March 01, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/01 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Toby James Marshall on behalf of Plaintiff Water and Sanitation Health Inc. (Marshall, Toby) |
|
Monday, January 25, 2016 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation/Remark (public entry)
Mon 01/25 9:23 AM
Updated Address for Attorney Eric J. Harrison, 5400 California Ave., SW., Seattle, WA 98136. (DS) |
||
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
23
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 01/22 3:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Rainforest Alliance Inc with JURY DEMAND, filed by Water and Sanitation Health Inc.(Harrison, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, December 29, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 12/29 1:57 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part dft's29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; pltf is given 30 days leave to file an amended complaint by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2015 | ||
utility
Terminate Motions (Public, notice to parties) Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 12/01 3:13 PM
Pursuant to the parties'32 Stipulated MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, Extend Trial Date and Related Dates this matter is STAYED pending the court's decision on Defendant's29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. The trial date and all pretrial deadlines are VACATED, to be reset if necessary after the court's ruling. (VE) |
||
Monday, November 30, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Stay
Mon 11/30 5:07 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Stay or in the Alternative, Extend Trial Date and Related Dates by Defendant Rainforest Alliance Inc. Noting Date 11/30/2015, (Elkanich, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 10, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 07/10 11:27 AM
REPLY, filed by Defendant Rainforest Alliance Inc, TO RESPONSE to29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Elkanich, David) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 07/06 7:24 AM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Water and Sanitation Health Inc, to29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM .(Harrison, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
Thursday, June 18, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 06/18 2:36 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Rainforest Alliance Inc. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 7/10/2015, (Elkanich, David) |
|
Tuesday, June 02, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/02 3:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones terminating9 Motion invoking RCW 4.24.525 to strike Plaintiff's complaint. (JJ) |
|
Friday, May 01, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
order
RAJ Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates
Fri 05/01 10:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 5 days. JURY TRIAL is set for 3/28/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 5/29/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2015, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/30/2015, Discovery completed by 11/30/2015, Dispositive motions due by 12/29/2015, Motions in Limine due by 2/29/2016, Pretrial Order due by 3/14/2016, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 3/21/2016, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
5
pgs
misc
Status Report
Wed 04/01 4:43 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Rainforest Alliance Inc (Elkanich, David) |
|
Friday, March 27, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
5
pgs
respm
Declaration
Fri 03/27 4:43 PM
DECLARATION of Molly Start filed by Defendant Rainforest Alliance Inc re9 MOTION Motion to Strike Pursuant to RCW 4.25.525(Elkanich, David) |
|
Att: 1 50 pgs Exhibit A | ||
24 | 24
3
pgs
respm
Declaration
Fri 03/27 4:42 PM
DECLARATION of Diane Jukofsky filed by Defendant Rainforest Alliance Inc re9 MOTION Motion to Strike Pursuant to RCW 4.25.525 (Elkanich, David) |
|
23 | 23
13
pgs
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 03/27 4:39 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant Rainforest Alliance Inc, TO RESPONSE to9 MOTION Motion to Strike Pursuant to RCW 4.25.525 (Elkanich, David) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
order
2 - Minute Order
Thu 03/26 12:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Richard A. Jones. It is ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than 4/1/2015. (VE) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
10
pgs
trial
Exhibit
Mon 03/23 2:20 PM
EXHIBIT Appendix C re18 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Water and Sanitation Health Inc (Harrison, Eric) |
|
20 | 20
43
pgs
trial
Exhibit
Mon 03/23 2:18 PM
EXHIBIT Appendix B re18 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Water and Sanitation Health Inc (Harrison, Eric) |
|
Friday, March 20, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Declaration
Fri 03/20 8:44 PM
DECLARATION of Eric Harrison filed by Plaintiff Water and Sanitation Health Inc re9 MOTION Motion to Strike Pursuant to RCW 4.25.525(Harrison, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
18 | 18
19
pgs
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 03/20 8:40 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Water and Sanitation Health Inc, to9 MOTION Motion to Strike Pursuant to RCW 4.25.525 . Oral Argument Requested.(Harrison, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 10 pgs Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, March 10, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/10 10:16 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Water and Sanitation Health Inc (Harrison, Eric) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/10 10:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric Harrison on behalf of Plaintiff Water and Sanitation Health Inc. (Harrison, Eric) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date
Thu 03/05 11:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER terminating pltf's11 Motion for Extension of Time; renoting dft's9 MOTION to Strike Pursuant to RCW 4.25.525 : Noting Date 3/27/2015, by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) |
|
Wednesday, March 04, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 03/04 3:17 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendant Rainforest Alliance Inc, to11 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Elkanich, David) |
|
Tuesday, March 03, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order to Re-Note Motion
Tue 03/03 11:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING pltf's11 MOTION for Extension of Time ; Noting Date 3/6/2015, by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS) |
|
Thursday, February 26, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Declaration
Fri 02/27 11:12 AM
DECLARATION of Eric J. Harrison filed by Plaintiff Water and Sanitation Health Inc re11 MOTION for Extension of Time (RS) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time-Other
Fri 02/27 11:10 AM
MOTION to extend response deadline by Plaintiff Water and Sanitation Health Inc.(RS) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 19, 2015 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public, notice to parties)
Thu 02/19 4:11 PM
Noting Date Set/Reset re9 MOTION Motion to Strike Pursuant to RCW 4.25.525 : Noting Date 3/6/2015. Defendant filed its motion to strike with no noting date, in violation of LCR 7(b)(1). The court notes the motion for March 6, 2015, in accordance with LCR 7(d)(3). The court will terminate any future motion that Defendant fails to note in accordance with the local rules. (VE) |
||
Wednesday, February 18, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Declaration
Wed 02/18 2:25 PM
DECLARATION of Ria Stout filed by Defendant Rainforest Alliance Inc re9 MOTION Motion to Strike Pursuant to RCW 4.25.525 (Elkanich, David) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 02/18 2:23 PM
MOTION Motion to Strike Pursuant to RCW 4.25.525 by Defendant Rainforest Alliance Inc. Oral Argument Requested.(Elkanich, David) |
|
Thursday, February 05, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
utility
Notice of Corrected Image/Document
Thu 02/05 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re:7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. Order has been amended to reflect correct Defendant. (Corrected image is attached.) (cc: Eric J. Harrison) (VE) |
|
7 | 7
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Thu 02/05 11:02 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/9/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/16/2015, Joint Status Report due by 3/23/2015, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Eric J. Harrison) (VE) |
|
Friday, January 30, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Verification of State Court Records
Fri 01/30 2:18 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Rainforest Alliance Inc (Elkanich, David) |
|
Tuesday, January 27, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 01/27 2:58 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Rainforest Alliance Inc (Elkanich, David) |
|
Tuesday, January 20, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 01/20 4:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Rainforest Alliance Inc. (Elkanich, David) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Judge Assignment Letter
Tue 01/20 11:13 AM
LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. Copy of letter mailed to Pro Se plaintiff. (ST) |
|
utility
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines
Tue 01/20 11:07 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/27/2015. Copy of docket/notice mailed to Pro Se plaintiff. (ST) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 01/20 11:11 AM
Judge Richard A Jones added. (ST) |
||
Friday, January 16, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice-Other
Fri 01/16 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO PLAINTIFF ; filed by Defendant Rainforest Alliance, Inc.(Elkanich, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 01/16 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 14 2-33522 9 SEA; , filed by Rainforest Alliance, Inc.(Elkanich, David) |
|
Att: 1 43 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |