|
GPO
Jun 06 2016
JUDGMENT as to GEORGE RICHARD DENNIS (2), Count 1, Imprisonment for a term of 24 months with 3 years supervised release and a special assessment of $100.00. Counts 2 and 3 are dismissed upon motion of the United States. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/6/2016. (TMD)
|
|
GPO
Jun 15 2016
JUDGMENT as to ZACHARY SCOTT JOHN (4) - Counts 1, Probation for a term of 2 years and a $100.00 special assessment. Counts 2 & 3 are dismissed upon motion of the United States. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/15/2016. (TMD)
|
|
GPO
Jul 20 2016
JUDGMENT as to CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL BATTA (3) - Count 1, imprisonment for a term of 12 months with 1 year supervised release and a special assessment of $100.00. Counts 2 and 3 are dismissed upon motion of the United States. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/20/2016. (TMD)
|
|
GPO
Aug 25 2016
JUDGMENT as to NIGEL S. DECHRISTOPHER (1) - Count 1, imprisonment for a term of 18 months with 2 years supervised release, a fine of $500.00 and special assessment of $100.00. Counts 2 and 3 are dismissed upon motion of the United States. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 8/25/2016. (TMD)
|