Johnsonet al v. Senior Home Care, Inc. et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | James S Moody, Jr |
Referred: | Thomas G Wilson |
Case #: | 8:15-cv-01670 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 10, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 12, 2016 8:07 AM EST |
Defendant
Lynne Hebert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Senior Home Care, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna M. Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark R. Kopacz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Major
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Miller
#221805 Cross City Correctional Institution P.O. Box 1500
Cross City, FL 32628 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 04, 2015 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/04 4:05 PM
NOTICE by Lynne Hebert, Senior Home Care, Inc. of Filing Joint Motion to Consolidate Related Cases(Dawson, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Joint Motion to Consolidate Related Cases | ||
Thursday, August 06, 2015 | ||
39 | 39
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 08/06 3:55 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge James S. Moody, Jr. New case number: 8:15-cv-1670-T-30TGW. Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell no longer assigned to the case. (EJC) |
|
38 | 38
order
Order on motion to transfer case
Thu 08/06 2:20 PM
ORDER granting 37 Joint Motion to Transfer Related Case. Pursuant to Local Rule 1.04(b), this case is hereby TRANSFERRED to United States District Judge James S. Moody, Tampa Division, for all further proceedings. The Clerk is hereby directed to transfer this case to District Judge James S. Moody, Tampa Division. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/6/2015. (BGS) |
|
Wednesday, August 05, 2015 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Transfer case
Wed 08/05 2:14 PM
Joint MOTION to transfer case - Related Case by Lynne Hebert, Senior Home Care, Inc.. (Dawson, Craig) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2015 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Transfer case
Tue 08/04 3:49 PM
DOCUMENT TERMINATED counsel notified to refile using the correct attorney log in and signature. Joint MOTION to transfer case - Related Case by Lynne Hebert, Senior Home Care, Inc.. (McClelland, Dennis) Modified on 8/5/2015 (EJC). |
|
Friday, July 17, 2015 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order of recusal
Fri 07/17 11:12 AM
ORDER of recusal. Judge James D. Whittemore recused. Case reassigned to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell for all further proceedings Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 7/17/2015. (BES) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of designation of track
Fri 07/17 10:03 AM
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (AO) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice to counsel
Thu 07/16 1:27 PM
NOTICE to counsel of new case number and judge assignment 8:15-cv-1670-T-27TGW(signed by deputy clerk). (JNB) |
|
32 | 32
transfer
Case transferred in - district transfer
Thu 07/16 1:26 PM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 3:14-cv-00613. File received electronically |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on motion to extend time
Thu 07/16 11:05 AM
ORDER granting 28 Joint MOTION to Change Venue. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 7/15/2015. (djb) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] |
|
30 | 30 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
29 | 29 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Tuesday, July 14, 2015 | ||
28 | 28 Joint MOTION to Change Venue by LYNNE HEBERT, SENIOR HOME CARE INC. (MCCLELLAND, DENNIS) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:28 Joint MOTION to Change Venue (djb) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | ||
Friday, June 12, 2015 | ||
27 | 27 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
26 | 26 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Thursday, May 14, 2015 | ||
25 | 25 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
24 | 24 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Wednesday, April 15, 2015 | ||
23 | 23 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
22 | 22 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Friday, March 13, 2015 | ||
21 | 21 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
20 | 20 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Thursday, February 12, 2015 | ||
19 | 19 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
18 | 18 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Friday, January 16, 2015 | ||
17 | 17 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER re 16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The initial scheduling order is modified to the extent set out in the joint report. All discovery must be completed by 9/1/2015 . Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 1/16/2015. (djb) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
16 | 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (MCCLELLAND, DENNIS) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:6 Scheduling Order, (Rule 26 Meeting Report not filed) (djb) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | ||
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:16 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (djb) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | ||
Thursday, January 15, 2015 | ||
15 | 15 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
14 | 14 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Tuesday, December 23, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LYNNE HEBERT, SENIOR HOME CARE INC identifying Corporate Parent KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING INC, Corporate Parent SHC HOLDING INC, Corporate Parent PF DEVELOPMENT 21 LLC, Corporate Parent KINDRED REHAB SERVICES INC, Corporate Parent KINDRED HEALTHCARE INC for SENIOR HOME CARE INC.. (DAWSON, CRAIG) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
12 | 12 ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Defenses by LYNNE HEBERT, SENIOR HOME CARE INC. (MCCLELLAND, DENNIS) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Wednesday, December 17, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTE to Filer - A reminder that party names (including aliases, corporate parents, etc.) are to be added using ALL CAPS and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on the clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. Re10 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons filed by LYNNE HEBERT, SENIOR HOME CARE INC identifying Corporate Parent Kindred Healthcare Operating, Inc. (djb) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Tuesday, December 16, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LYNNE HEBERT, SENIOR HOME CARE INC identifying Corporate Parent Kindred Healthcare Operating, Inc. for SENIOR HOME CARE INC.. (DAWSON, CRAIG) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Monday, December 15, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
8 | 8 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by DONNA M JOHNSON. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Thursday, December 11, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER granting 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 12/11/2014. LYNNE HEBERT answer due 12/23/2014; SENIOR HOME CARE INC answer due 12/23/2014. (djb) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Tuesday, December 02, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/16/2014 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/15/2015 . Discovery due by 5/1/2015 . Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 12/2/2014. (djb) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, Unopposed (see proposed initial scheduling order) (djb) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | ||
Monday, December 01, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, Unopposed by LYNNE HEBERT, SENIOR HOME CARE INC. (MCCLELLAND, DENNIS) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Thursday, November 13, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Pendency of Other or Prior Similar Actions by DONNA M JOHNSON, MARK R KOPACZ, MELISSA MAJOR, JAMES MILLER, BETTY STEWART (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Tuesday, November 04, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to LYNNE HEBERT (main document), #1 SENIOR HOME CARE INC. (djb) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Monday, November 03, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 1129-3097168.), filed by JAMES MILLER, DONNA M JOHNSON, MELISSA MAJOR, MARK R KOPACZ, BETTY STEWART. (TALBOTT, JEREMIAH) [Transferred from flnd on 7/16/2015.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Supplement SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 8 Supplement SUMMONS |