KATTENHORN v. RUBY TUESDAY, INC et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Douglas E Arpert |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-08254 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 24, 2015 |
Re-opened: | Jul 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday May 22, 2016 4:40 AM EDT |
Cross Claimant
RESTAURANT LIGHTING CONCEPTS
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
EE&E RETROFIT, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
RUBY TUESDAY, INC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
RUBY TUESDAY, INC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
KAREN KATTENHORN
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
JANE DOE AND JOHN DOES #1- #5
|
|
Cross Defendant
ABC COMPANY #1- #5
|
|
Cross Defendant
JUAN R. RIVERA
|
|
Cross Defendant
RESTAURANT LIGHTING CONCEPTS
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
EE&E RETROFIT, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
arbtre
|
|
Defendant
RUBY TUESDAY, INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JUAN R. RIVERA
|
|
Defendant
RESTAURANT LIGHTING CONCEPTS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JANE DOE AND JOHN DOES #1- #5
|
|
Defendant
EE&E RETROFIT, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ABC COMPANY #1- #5
|
|
Notice Only
arbtre
|
|
Plaintiff
KAREN KATTENHORN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago |
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 07/20 10:30 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS RUBY TUESDAY, INC., EE&E RETROFIT, LLC AND RESTAURANT LIGHTING CONCEPTS, LLC. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 7/20/2017. (seb) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 07/19 12:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice as to All Defendants by EE&E RETROFIT, LLC. (GOLDEN, KEVIN) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
order
Order of Dismissal
Mon 07/17 9:24 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice, and without costs. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 7/17/2017. (DS) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
order
Order 60-Day Administrative Termination
Thu 05/18 4:58 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 7/17/2017. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 5/18/2017. (DS) |
|
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 05/18 4:26 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Settlement Conference held on 5/18/2017. (ce3) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Letter
Fri 04/21 4:03 PM
Letter from Kevin golden. (GOLDEN, KEVIN) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Letter
Wed 04/19 11:14 AM
Letter from Amy L. Hansell, Esquire. (HANSELL, AMY) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 04/17 10:28 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: The Settlement Conference set for 4/20/2017 at 11:30 AM, has been adjourned and rescheduled for 5/18/2017 at 3:00 P.M., in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Trial counsel and client representatives with full settlement authority must attend. Counsel are to submit confidential settlement memos to chambers, via email to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov at least 48 hours in advance of the conference (ce3) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
utility
Remark (public)
Fri 03/17 11:48 AM
ATTENTION COUNSEL: PLEASE DISREGARD THE FOLLOWING DOCKET ENTRY REGARDING THE FINAL APPROVAL HEARING. IT WAS INADVERTENTLY DOCKETED IN THIS CASE. (ce3) |
||
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 03/10 3:34 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: The Final Approval Hearing set for 7/12/2017 at 10:00 A.M., has been adjourned and rescheduled for 7/18/2017 at 2:00 P.M. (ce3) |
||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 02/21 3:35 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: The Settlement Conference set for 4/13/2017 at 11:30 AM, has been adjourned and rescheduled for 4/13/2017 at 11:30 A.M., in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Trial counsel and client representatives with full settlement authority must attend. Counsel are to submit confidential settlement memos to chambers, via email to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov at least 48 hours in advance of the conference (ce3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 02/21 3:42 PM
CORRECTED Set/Reset Hearings: The Settlement Conference set for 4/13/2017 at 11:30 AM, has been adjourned and rescheduled for 4/20/2017 at 11:30 A.M., in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Trial counsel and client representatives with full settlement authority must attend. Counsel are to submit confidential settlement memos to chambers, via email to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov at least 48 hours in advance of the conference (ce3) |
||
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 02/16 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: The Court will conduct a Settlement Conference on 4/13/2017 at 11:30 A.M., in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Trial counsel and client representatives with full settlement authority must attend. Counsel are to submit confidential settlement memos to chambers, via email to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov at least 48 hours in advance of the conference.(ce3) |
||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 02/16 3:09 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 2/15/2017. (ce3) |
||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Letter
Fri 02/10 4:10 PM
Letter from Sidney P. Rossi, Esq..(ROSSI, SIDNEY) |
|
Att: 1 Dr. Ani Medical Expert Report & CV | ||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Letter
Mon 01/30 10:07 AM
Letter from Amy L. Hansell, Esquire. (HANSELL, AMY) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 01/23 12:33 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/15/2017 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for setting up and initiating the call. (ce3) |
||
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Letter
Fri 12/23 11:12 AM
Letter from Sidney P. Rossi, Esq., follow up to 12.19.16 conference. (ROSSI, SIDNEY) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 12/19 12:55 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Settlement Conference held on 12/19/2016. (ce3) |
||
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 12/15 3:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RUBY TUESDAY, INC of Clerk's Entry of Default against Juan Rivera (HANSELL, AMY) |
|
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 12/15 8:23 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to JUAN RIVERA for failure to appear. (eaj) |
||
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 12/14 2:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RUBY TUESDAY, INC re34 Request for Default against Juan R. Rivera (HANSELL, AMY) |
|
34 | 34
misc
Request for Default
Wed 12/14 2:09 PM
Request for Default by RUBY TUESDAY, INC against Juan R. Rivera.(YOUNG, DANIEL) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 11/15 11:09 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for subpoena and notice of deposition served on Juan Rivera on 11/01/2016, filed by RUBY TUESDAY, INC. (HANSELL, AMY) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Letter
Wed 11/09 12:41 PM
Letter from Kevin Golden. (GOLDEN, KEVIN) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Letter
Fri 11/04 9:42 AM
Letter from Amy L. Hansell, Esquire.(HANSELL, AMY) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order
Wed 10/26 4:16 PM
LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiff's application to quash of modify Defendant's subpoenas as follows: The Subpoenas directed to Carmencita T. Lanez, MD,Luybov Shkarupa, APN, Princeton House Behavioral Health, Dr. Felix Geller and Maryanne DeSantis, MD are quashed. The remaining Subpoenas are modified to exclude production of records pertaining to Plaintiff's mental condition and limiting the scope of production to those records related to Plaintiff's physical condition(s), injuries, treatment, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/26/2016. (mmh) |
|
29 | 29
order
Order
Wed 10/26 2:53 PM
CONSENT ORDER Extending Discovery. The deposition of Juan Rivera is set for 12/6/2016; Fact Discovery is extended to 12/16/2016; the 11/10/2016 is rescheduled for 12/19/2016 at 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/26/2016. (mmh) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Letter
Fri 10/21 1:54 PM
Letter from Amy L Hansell.(HANSELL, AMY) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order Extending Discovery | ||
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
service
Affidavit of Service Summons Returned Executed
Wed 10/19 11:17 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, RTI's Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, CIS served on Juan Rivera on 08/27/2016, filed by RUBY TUESDAY, INC., SUMMONS Returned Executed by RUBY TUESDAY, INC. (HANSELL, AMY) |
|
26 | 26
service
Affidavit of Service Summons Returned Executed
Wed 10/19 10:58 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, CIS, Track Assignment served on Juan R. Rivera on 11/28/2015, filed by RUBY TUESDAY, INC., SUMMONS Returned Executed by RUBY TUESDAY, INC. (HANSELL, AMY) |
|
Thursday, October 13, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
respoth
Response (NOT Motion)
Thu 10/13 10:38 AM
RESPONSE re24 Brief.(HANSELL, AMY) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G | ||
utility
Remark (public)
Thu 10/13 12:21 PM
ATTENTION COUNSEL: The Telephone Conference set for 10/13/2016 at 2:00PM has been adjourned without a new date. (ce3) |
||
Monday, October 10, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
respoth
Brief
Mon 10/10 4:39 PM
BRIEF Letter Brief to Quash Subpoenas of Def Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (ROSSI, SIDNEY) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 09/27 9:10 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 11/10/2016 at 11:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert; Fact Discovery due by 10/31/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/26/2016. (eaj) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 09/26 11:22 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 9/26/2016. (ce3) |
||
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Affidavit
Mon 09/19 12:35 PM
AFFIDAVIT of service by KAREN KATTENHORN.(ROSSI, SIDNEY) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Fri 09/09 4:55 PM
Letter from Amy L. Hansell, Esquire. (HANSELL, AMY) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order
Fri 09/09 2:07 PM
LETTER ORDER that all outstanding discovery responses must be served by 9/16/2016; any remaining discovery deficiencies will be addressed during the 9/26/2016 telephone status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/9/2016. (mmh) |
|
Friday, September 02, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 09/02 5:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena served on Jazmine Henry, Carrol Irving on 8/09/2016, 8/11/2016, filed by KAREN KATTENHORN.(ROSSI, SIDNEY) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, September 01, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Affidavit
Thu 09/01 6:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT Proof of Service by KAREN KATTENHORN.(ROSSI, SIDNEY) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
qc
QC - Seal - Restricted Document (non-confidential)
Thu 09/01 8:46 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Sidney Rossi has designated as confidential materials and restricted access to the Summons Returned Executed18 , submitted incorrectly as an Affidavit filed on 9/1/2016. This document does not appear to be the subject of a motion or order. Please submit a certification stating that this document is to be marked Confidential Material or that this document's access was restricted in error. Please be advised, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3, you must file a motion for leave to have a document sealed. (eaj) |
||
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Wed 08/31 11:37 AM
Letter from Amy L. Hansell, Esquire.(HANSELL, AMY) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service & Letter to J. Rivera, | ||
Att: 2 Letters to S. Rossi 07.15.16 & 08.03.16, | ||
Att: 3 Letter to K. Golden 08.22.16 | ||
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 08/08 3:17 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Judge Peter G. Sheridan no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 8/8/2016. (km) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 07/29 12:55 PM
REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER 1: Telephone Conference set for 9/26/2016 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, Defendants to initiate the call; Fact and witness Discovery due by 9/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/29/2016. (eaj) |
|
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Thu 07/07 10:36 AM
ORDER, Proposed Revised Scheduling Order due by 7/27/2016, Telephone Conference set for 10/13/2016 at 2:00PM. Defense Counsel to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/6/2016. (km) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Wed 07/06 3:50 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 7/6/2016. (ce3) |
||
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 05/13 10:53 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Conference held on 5/13/2016. (ce3) |
||
Monday, April 25, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Discovery Confidentiality Order
Mon 04/25 3:10 PM
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/25/2016. (mmh) |
|
Monday, April 04, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Mon 04/04 4:42 PM
LETTER ORDER granting request that the proposed Confidentiality Orders be submitted on or before 4/8/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/4/2016. (mmh) |
|
Friday, April 01, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Fri 04/01 2:33 PM
Letter from Amy L. Hansell, Esquire. (HANSELL, AMY) |
|
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 03/03 2:07 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/13/2016 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Fact Discovery due by 8/1/2016. Motions to amend/join new parties due by 7/1/2016. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/23/2016. Telephone Status Conference set for 7/6/2016 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/3/2016. (mmh) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Wed 03/02 9:52 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/2/2016. (ce3) |
||
Wednesday, February 17, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 02/17 7:45 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: The Initial Conference set for 2/18/2016 9:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert has been adjourned and rescheduled via telephone for 3/2/2016 at 9:30 A.M. Attention Counsel: Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for setting up and initiating the call. (ce3) |
||
Monday, February 08, 2016 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 02/08 9:58 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: The Initial Conference set for 2/11/2016 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert has been adjourned and rescheduled for 2/18/2016 at 9:30 A.M. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please do not e-file. Please e-mail this document to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov (ce3) |
||
Friday, January 29, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Crossclaim
Fri 01/29 4:17 PM
ANSWER to Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by RESTAURANT LIGHTING CONCEPTS, EE&E RETROFIT, LLC.(GOLDEN, KEVIN) |
|
Monday, December 07, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/07 12:51 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by RESTAURANT LIGHTING CONCEPTS. (GOLDEN, KEVIN) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/07 12:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by EE&E RETROFIT, LLC. (GOLDEN, KEVIN) |
|
6 | 6
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/07 11:08 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint 5 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by RUBY TUESDAY, INC. (HANSELL, AMY) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Tue 12/01 5:17 PM
Ruby Tuesday, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against EE&E RETROFIT, LLC, RESTAURANT LIGHTING CONCEPTS, JUAN R. RIVERA by RUBY TUESDAY, INC.(HANSELL, AMY) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/01 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN B. GOLDEN on behalf of EE&E RETROFIT, LLC (GOLDEN, KEVIN) |
|
Tuesday, November 24, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 11/24 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 2/11/2016 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please do not e-file. Please e-mail this document to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov (ce3) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 11/24 4:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by RUBY TUESDAY, INC. (HANSELL, AMY) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 11/24 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RUBY TUESDAY, INC from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY, case number MID-L 15-5834 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 6777090), filed by RUBY TUESDAY, INC.(km) |
|
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Referred to Arbitration
Tue 11/24 3:36 PM
CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (km) |
||
qc
QC - Lack of Disclosure Statement
Tue 11/24 3:37 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (km) |