|
GPO
Aug 30 2010
ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL re 1 Complaint filed by Howard Sanders. Lawrence H Pomeroy, Richard Hallworth and Haresh B Pandya terminated. Signed by District Judge Gerald E Rosen. (RGun)
|
|
GPO
Sep 07 2011
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 51 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Howard Sanders, 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Howard Sanders, 43 MOTION to Dismiss , Brief in Support, with Certificate of Service filed by Michigan Department of Corrections Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul J. Komives. (EBut)
|
|
GPO
Jan 10 2012
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER re 54 MOTION to Compel Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul J. Komives. (EBut)
|
|
GPO
Feb 29 2012
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST MICHIGAN DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 51 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Denying 48 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Howard Sanders and Granting 43 Motion to Dismiss filed by Michigan Department of Corrections. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (RGun)
|
|
GPO
May 09 2012
MWil)ORDER Setting Deadline re 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Proof of Service filed by Prisoner Health Services, Inc., ( Plaintiff's Response due by 6/8/2012) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul J. Komives. (
|
|
GPO
Jan 29 2013
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Proof of Service filed by Prisoner Health Services, Inc Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul J. Komives. (EBut)
|
|
GPO
Mar 08 2013
ORDER Adopting Magistrate Judge's 80 Report and Recommendation and Dismissing 7 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (JOwe)
|
|
GPO
Mar 08 2013
JUDGMENT Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (JOwe)
|