Mitchell v. BLU Sushi Downtown LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Carol Mirando |
Referred: | Carol Mirando |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00731 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 25, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 15, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday May 23, 2016 4:56 AM EDT |
Defendant
BLU Sushi Downtown LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eric Mawby
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Emrah Sevinch
an individual 2262 First Street Suite 104
Fort Myers, FL 33901 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christa Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago |
Wednesday, June 15, 2016 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Judgment
Wed 06/15 11:03 AM
JUDGMENT (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (drn) |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion for Settlement Order on Motion to Certify Class
Tue 06/14 6:00 PM
ORDER granting 39 Amended Joint Motion for Approval of Parties' Settlement Agreement and Dismissal with Prejudice; denying as moot 16 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Collective Action and Facilitate Notice to Potential Class Members with Incorporated Memorandum of Law. The Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing the case with prejudice, terminate all deadlines and motions, and close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 6/14/2016. (ANW) |
|
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Settlement
Tue 05/17 4:10 PM
Amended MOTION for Settlement APPROVAL OF PARTIES' SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Christa Mitchell.(Brock, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Wed 04/20 6:25 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 37 Joint Motion for Approval of Parties' Settlement Agreement and Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 4/20/2016. (ANW) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Settlement
Fri 04/08 4:49 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement APPROVAL OF PARTIES' SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Christa Mitchell.(Brock, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 07, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 04/08 10:41 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. New case number: 2:15-cv-731-FtM-CM. (SLU) |
|
35 | 35
order
Order on consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/07 3:26 PM
ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/7/2016. (LMF) |
|
Wednesday, April 06, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/06 2:36 PM
CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Christa Mitchell, (Skyler Scott), BLU Sushi Downtown, LLC, Emrah Sevinch, and Eric Mawby. (Brock, Robert) Modified on 4/6/2016 to add filers and edit docket text (SLU) |
|
33 | 33
order
*Order no pdf
Wed 04/06 10:35 AM
ENDORSED ORDER. If the parties wish to consent to the Magistrate Judge, as they have expressed in their Joint Notice (Doc. # 31 ), they must complete and file the Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form available on the undersigned's website (http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/forms/Civil/AO_085-0109-MagConsentForm.pdf). Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/6/2016. (EMK) |
|
32 | 32
order
*Order no pdf
Wed 04/06 8:59 AM
ENDORSED ORDER The parties notified the Court that this case has settled. (Doc. #31). Plaintiff is therefore required to provide the Court with settlement documents including a brief description of the terms of the settlement, the number of hours and lost wages originally claimed by the Plaintiff and whether or not the Plaintiff's claims were settled by compromise. In addition, Plaintiff should inform the Court if attorney's fees were negotiated in accordance with Bonetti v. Embarq. Mgmt. Co., 2009 WL 2371407 (M.D. Fla. Aug. 2009). The FLSA settlement documents are due on or before April 20, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 4/6/2016. (ANW) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of settlement
Thu 03/24 12:27 PM
JOINT NOTICE of settlement and Consent to Magistrate by Christa Mitchell, Emrah Sevinch, Eric Mawby, and BLU Sushi Downtown LLC (Brock, Robert) Modified on 3/24/2016 to add filers and edit docket text (SLU) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/15 10:43 AM
NOTICE of withdrawal of consent to join collective action by Christa Mitchell (Brock, Robert) Modified on 3/15/2016 to edit docket text (SLU) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
respoth
Answer to court interrogatories
Tue 02/16 5:26 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories re:13 FLSA scheduling order with deadlines by Christa Mitchell. (Brock, Robert) |
|
Thursday, February 04, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 02/04 10:41 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re16 MOTION to Certify Class COLLECTIVE ACTION filed by Christa Mitchell. (Brock, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Tue 02/02 3:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re25 Interested persons order by Emrah Sevinch identifying Corporate Parent BLU Sushi Downtown LLC for Emrah Sevinch.. (Morgan, Jack) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 02/01 1:05 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION to Certify Class COLLECTIVE ACTION filed by BLU Sushi Downtown LLC, Eric Mawby, Emrah Sevinch. (Morgan, Jack) |
|
Tuesday, January 26, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Interested persons order
Tue 01/26 9:40 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/9/2016. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/26/2016. (SLU) |
|
Monday, January 25, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
answer
Answer to amended complaint
Mon 01/25 3:44 PM
Defendant, Emrah Sevinch's, ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 15 Amended Complaint by Emrah Sevinch.(Morgan, Jack) |
|
23 | 23
answer
Answer to amended complaint
Mon 01/25 3:34 PM
Defendant, Eric Mawby's ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 15 Amended Complaint by Eric Mawby.(Morgan, Jack) |
|
22 | 22
answer
Answer to amended complaint
Mon 01/25 3:18 PM
Defendant, Blu Sushi Downtown, LLC's ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 15 Amended Complaint by BLU Sushi Downtown LLC.(Morgan, Jack) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 01/25 1:05 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's MOtion to Certify Collective Action and Facilitate Notice to Potential Class Members. For good cause shown and because the motion is unopposed, Defendants shall have up to and including February 2, 2016 to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Collective Action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 1/25/2016. (ANW) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 01/25 10:46 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Collective Action and facilitate notice to potential class members by All Defendants. (Morgan, Jack) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. Modified on 1/25/2016 to edit docket text (SLU) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of consent to join
Thu 01/21 3:47 PM
NOTICE of consent to join by Christa Mitchell . (Brock, Robert) |
|
Monday, January 18, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of consent to join
Mon 01/18 4:00 PM
NOTICE of consent to join by Christa Mitchell . (Brock, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of consent to join
Tue 01/12 5:20 PM
NOTICE of consent to join by Christa Mitchell . (Brock, Robert) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Certify Class
Tue 01/12 5:15 PM
MOTION to Certify Class COLLECTIVE ACTION by Christa Mitchell.(Brock, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 | ||
Friday, January 08, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 01/08 3:11 PM
FIRST AMENDED COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Christa Mitchell.(Brock, Robert) Modified on 1/8/2016 to edit docket text (SLU) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Compliance notice
Thu 01/07 9:19 AM
NOTICE of compliance re13 FLSA scheduling order with deadlines dated January 4, 2016 by BLU Sushi Downtown LLC, Eric Mawby (Morgan, Jack) |
|
Monday, January 04, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
FLSA scheduling order with deadlines
Mon 01/04 4:52 PM
FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. By 1/25/2016 parties shall serve copies upon each other as stated in the order; By 3/14/2016 parties are to meet and confer; Answer to court interrogatories due by 2/15/2016, Settlement Report due by 4/4/2016. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/4/2016. (LMF) |
|
Thursday, December 31, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Thu 12/31 10:42 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re10 Interested persons order by BLU Sushi Downtown LLC, Eric Mawby. (Morgan, Jack) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Thu 12/31 10:39 AM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by BLU Sushi Downtown LLC, Eric Mawby. Related case(s): no (Morgan, Jack) |
|
10 | 10
order
Interested persons order
Thu 12/31 9:26 AM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to BLU Sushi Downtown LLC and Eric Mawby. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/14/2016. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/31/2015. (drn) |
|
Wednesday, December 30, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/30 5:13 PM
Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by BLU Sushi Downtown LLC, Eric Mawby.(Morgan, Jack) |
|
Tuesday, December 29, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Tue 12/29 4:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re6 Interested persons order by Christa Mitchell. (Brock, Robert) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Tue 12/29 4:33 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Christa Mitchell. Related case(s): No (Brock, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Interested persons order
Tue 12/15 1:47 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/29/2015. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/15/2015. (WRW) |
|
5 | 5
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Tue 12/15 1:46 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/29/2015. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/15/2015. (WRW) |
|
Monday, November 30, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Standing Order re: 25 pages
Mon 11/30 9:26 AM
STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/30/2015. (drn) |
|
Wednesday, November 25, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Fri 11/27 9:35 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Eric Mawby. (RMT) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons issued
Fri 11/27 9:30 AM
SUMMONS issued as to BLU Sushi Downtown LLC (RMT) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/27 9:29 AM
COMPLAINT against BLU Sushi Downtown LLC, Eric Mawby with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt number FTM008588) filed by Christa Mitchell.(RMT) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |