Simon v. LeBlanc et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | James T Trimble, Jr |
Referred: | Joseph H L Perez-Montes |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-02789 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 03, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 23, 2016 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Copy Work or Form Request (Public Entry No NEF)
Thu 03/16 1:56 PM
REQUEST from Ivory Lane Simon for copy of docket sheet. Clerk mailed copy of docket sheet on 03/16/2017. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (crt,ThomasSld, T) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, July 13, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Copy Work or Form Request (Public Entry No NEF)
Mon 07/18 3:37 PM
REQUEST from Ivory L Simon for Copy of Docket Sheet. Clerk mailed Copy of Docket Sheet on 07/18/2016. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, July 07, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
appeal
USCA Judgment
Thu 07/07 10:28 AM
USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE (certified copy) as to17 Notice of Appeal filed by Ivory Lane Simon the appeal is DISMISSED as of July 7, 2016, for want of prosecution. The appellant failed to timely file appellant's brief. (crt,WalkerSld, B) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2016 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Certified to USCA
Fri 05/27 10:57 AM
ELECTRONICALLY CERTIFIED Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re17 Notice of Appeal. ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL is now available to Appellate Counsel via the 5th Circuit Court of Appeals website. See Instructions for Access and Use of the Electronic Record Download Feature of CM/ECF by clicking[LINK:here] . (crt,WalkerSld, B) |
||
Wednesday, May 04, 2016 | ||
appeal
~Util - Set/Reset Appeal Deadlines
Wed 05/04 10:47 AM
Set Deadline for Clerk re17 Notice of Appeal: Certify Appeal Record 16-30334 by Clerk to COA 5/19/16. (crt,WalkerSld, B) |
||
Tuesday, May 03, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Wed 05/04 9:16 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $13.00. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceeding month until $505.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 5/2/16. (crt,WalkerSld, B) |
|
utility
ADI Receipt Entry
Tue 05/03 3:10 PM
Confirmation of receipt of payment from IVORY SIMON in the amount of $25.67. Transaction posted on 5/2/2016. Receipt number 0536-3059549 processed by Finance Import. (crt,Whidden ADI, C) |
||
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Proposed Order/Judgment (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Mon 05/02 12:43 AM
PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT re19 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal referred to Judge Trimble. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,WalkerSld, B) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal
Mon 05/02 12:41 AM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal by Ivory Lane Simon.(crt,WalkerSld, B) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
utility
Motions Transferred
Mon 05/02 12:44 AM
Motions Transferred regarding19 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. Motions referred to James T Trimble, Jr. (crt,WalkerSld, B) |
||
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 04/20 9:35 AM
USCA Case Number 16-30334 for17 Notice of Appeal filed by Ivory Lane Simon. (crt,WalkerSld, B) |
||
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
Fee Letter for Appeal Filing Fee
Wed 04/13 4:10 PM
FEE LETTER requesting payment of appeal filing fee sent to Ivory Lane Simon re17 Notice of Appeal(crt,WalkerSld, B) |
|
Att: 1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 04/13 3:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to16 Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order on Report and Recommendations, by Ivory Lane Simon. FEE STATUS: NOT PAID(crt,WalkerSld, B) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 03/23 9:50 AM
JUDGMENT ; adopting re13 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint is hereby DENIED AND DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A. The Clerk of Court is instructed to send a copy of this Judgment to the keeper of the three strikes list in Tyler, Texas. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 3/22/16. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minute Entry/Order Reassigning Case
Wed 03/16 5:32 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case transferred to Judge James T Trimble, Jr. Chief Judge Dee D Drell no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 3/16/16. (crt,Whidden, C) |
|
Thursday, February 11, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Thu 02/11 4:07 PM
OBJECTION to13 Report and Recommendations by Ivory Lane Simon. Response to Objection to R&R due by 2/25/2016(crt,HaikSld, K) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, February 02, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 02/02 2:30 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint, filed by Ivory Lane Simon. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's civil rights complaint be DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A. Objections to R&R due by 2/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 02/01/16. (crt,Tice, Y)(a) |
|
Monday, January 25, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 01/26 9:26 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $25.67. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/25/2016. (crt,HaikSld, K) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Proposed Order/Judgment (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Mon 01/25 8:55 AM
PROPOSED ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 01/25 8:38 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ivory Lane Simon. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, January 08, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension (Other)
Fri 01/08 11:39 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension. Amended Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis due by 2/8/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/8/16. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension (Other)
Thu 01/07 3:21 PM
MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to Complete In Forma Pauperis Application by Ivory Lane Simon. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Clerk referred motion despite case deficiency as it pertains to corrective efforts.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
7 | 7
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 01/07 3:19 PM
DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ivory Lane Simon. No accounts officer page. Clerk resent form per request. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes once deficiency is corrected.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, December 21, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 12/21 5:30 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Magistrate Judge James D Kirk no longer assigned to case. Any motion and/or proceeding currently set before Magistrate Judge James D Kirk is hereby reset before Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. All future pleadings shall reflect the current judge assignment. Issued by Tony R Moore, Clerk. (crt,Brown, A) |
|
Tuesday, December 08, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Sec P - Deficiency Order
Thu 12/10 12:04 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 1/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge James D Kirk on 12/8/2015.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 IFP form | ||
Monday, December 07, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Order/Judgment (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Mon 12/07 8:51 AM
PROPOSED ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kirk. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
Thursday, December 03, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 12/04 10:45 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ivory Lane Simon. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/04 10:44 AM
COMPLAINT against Chapman, R Crabtree, Dawson, Keith Deville, Jody Floyd, Hawkins, Mary Hayes, James LeBlanc, Burton Michot, Tammy Raynes, X Y Z Insurance Co with Jury Demand filed by Ivory Lane Simon.(crt,Keller, J) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Envelope | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 12/07 8:49 AM
CASE Assigned to Chief Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge James D Kirk. Motions referred to James D Kirk. (crt,Thigpen, M) |