USA v. Carvajal Barrios
Florida Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 1:13-cr-20345 |
Case Filed: | May 16, 2013 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 09, 2016 3:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
Hugo Carvajal Barrios (1)
|
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/15/2023 6:02 AM EST |
Thursday, May 16, 2013 | ||
1 | 1 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Hugo Carvajal Barrios. Responses due by 6/3/2013 (gm1) | |
2 | 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal as to Hugo Carvajal Barrios (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 5/16/2013. (gm1) | |
3 | 3 7 pgs INDICTMENT as to Hugo Carvajal Barrios (1) count(s) 1 AND FORFEITURE. (gm1) |