Gordon P. Jones, Chapter 7 Trustee v. Clearone Advantage, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-01949
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-01949
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Funk |
Case #: | 3:15-ap-00386 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 06, 2016 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Clearone Advantage, LLC
1200 S. Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gordon P. Jones, Chapter 7 Trustee
100 N. Laura Street, Suite 701
Jacksonville, FL 32202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 06, 2016 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 04/06 8:16 AM
Adversary Case 3:15-ap-386 Closed. (Nancy) |
||
Tuesday, March 22, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Tue 03/22 11:06 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by Eugene H Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff Gordon P. Jones, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Johnson, Eugene) |
|
Thursday, February 04, 2016 | ||
court
Compromise Cross-Reference
Fri 02/05 12:16 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 3:15-bk-01949-JAF . (Tonya) |
||
Monday, February 01, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order (Generic)
Mon 02/01 8:28 AM
Agreed Order Approving Joint Stipulation to Enlarge Time for Defendant to File Response to Adversary Complaint . Service Instructions: Evan Klinek is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Robert) |
|
Thursday, January 28, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Thu 01/28 2:29 PM
Stipulation to Enlarge Time for Defendant to File its Response to Adversary Complaint Filed by Eugene H Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff Gordon P. Jones, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Johnson, Eugene) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proof of Service
Tue 12/15 2:42 PM
Proof of Service of Administrative Order FLMB-2014-10. Filed by Eugene H Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff Gordon P. Jones, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Johnson, Eugene) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Summons Service Executed
Tue 12/15 2:38 PM
Service Executed of Summons, Complaint, on Defendant, Clearone Advantage, LLC Filed by Eugene H Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff Gordon P. Jones, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Johnson, Eugene) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Tue 12/15 8:33 AM
Summons issued on Clearone Advantage, LLC along with Administrative Order FLMB-2014-10 - Prescribing Procedures for Adversary Proceedings. Answer Due 01/14/2016. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. (ADIclerk) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Original
Mon 12/14 8:43 AM
Complaint by Gordon P. Jones, Chapter 7 Trustee against Clearone Advantage, LLC. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [13 ]. (Johnson, Eugene) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |