Jorge Dell'Aquila et al v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-05696 |
Nature of Suit | 355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 11, 2016 3:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Volkswagen of America Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Jorge Dell'Aquila
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carrie Ullmer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
utility
MDL Member Case Closed
Thu 08/06 11:06 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to the Court's order of 7/21/2020 in the MDL 3:15-md-02672-CRB, master file (dkt. #7629), civil member case no. 3:15-cv-05696-CRB is terminated. cc: JPMDL (tnS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Transcript
Mon 11/07 9:29 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/03/2016, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2017. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 11/7/2016) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Transcript
Thu 03/24 12:59 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/24/16, before Judge Breyer. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number 626-688-7509;pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2016. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 3/24/2016) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 01/21 5:03 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7: Order Appointing Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, and Government Coordinating Counsel. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on January 21, 2016. (crblc4S COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016) |
|
Monday, December 14, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 12/14 1:47 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Informing all Parties that this case is now with the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Re16 Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015) |
|
16 | 16
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 12/14 1:39 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:15-cv-01525. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, December 11, 2015 | ||
15 | 15 TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multi Litigation, MDL 2672, that the action is transferred to USDC, Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to Honorable Charles R. Breyer for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lwag) | |
Friday, November 13, 2015 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING DECISION BY UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION by Judge David O. Carter. (See document for details). Case stayed. (dgo) | |
Monday, November 09, 2015 | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Richard E Donahoo counsel for Plaintiffs Jorge Dell'Aquila, Carrie Ullmer. Changing Firm Name to Donahoo & Associates, PC. Filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Dell'Aquila and Carrie Ullmer, et al.. (Donahoo, Richard) | |
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
12 | 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., identifying Volkswagen AG. (Marmolejo, Matthew) | |
11 | 11 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Related Case(s): 5:15-cv-1930-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07390-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-7375-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07432-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07391-DOC-SP, 5:15-cv-01948-DOC-SP, 5:15-cv-02024-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07431-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07429-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07430-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07563-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07475-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07394-MMM-SP, 2:15-cv-07473-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07474-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07615-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07477-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07517-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07560-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-7395-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-7367-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07566-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07604-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07570-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07605-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07688-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07637-DOC-SP, 8:15-cv-01554-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07629-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07650-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07655-DOC-SP, 8:15-cv-01571-DOC-KES, 2:15-cv-07564-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07716-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07741-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07997-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-07962-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-08016-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-08126-DOC-SP, 5:15-cv-02152-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-08228-DOC-SP, 2:15-cv-08259-DOC-SP, 5:15-cv-02140-DOC-SP (Marmolejo, Matthew) | |
10 | 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. answer now due 11/30/2015, re Amended Complaint/Petition,9 filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(Attorney Matthew Henry Marmolejo added to party Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Marmolejo, Matthew) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
9 | 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Dell'Aquila, Carrie Ullmer(Donahoo, Richard) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to First Amended Complaint | ||
Tuesday, September 22, 2015 | ||
8 | 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) | |
7 | 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., and Volkswagen of America, Inc. (jtil) | |
6 | 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) | |
Monday, September 21, 2015 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Dell'Aquila, Carrie Ullmer, (Donahoo, Richard) | |
3 | 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Dell'Aquila, Carrie Ullmer. (Donahoo, Richard) | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Dell'Aquila, Carrie Ullmer. (Donahoo, Richard) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16483481 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Dell'Aquila, Carrie Ullmer. (Attorney Richard E Donahoo added to party Jorge Dell'Aquila(pty:pla), Attorney Richard E Donahoo added to party Carrie Ullmer(pty:pla))(Donahoo, Richard) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Class Action Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Class Action Complaint |