Jordan v. HAL Antillen NV et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert S Lasnik |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-01971 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Dec 15, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 12, 2016 1:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
HAL Antillen NV
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Holland America Line - USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Holland America Line N.V.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Holland America Line, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Holland America Line Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Holland America Line NV
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ms. Joanne P. Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joanne P. Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 05/11 10:34 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Occurrence of Alternate Dispute Resolution
Fri 05/05 5:56 AM
NOTICE from Mediator John G. Cooper, that on 5/3/2017, the parties participated in a mediation. This matter is now resolved. (Cooper, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 04/25 2:58 PM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Joanne P. Jordan, TO RESPONSE to20 MOTION for Leave Allowing Video or Telephonic Trial Testimony (Olsson, Marissa) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Declaration
Mon 04/24 4:15 PM
DECLARATION of Nicholas S. Politis in Support of Partial Opposition of Defs HAL to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Allowing Video or Telephonic Testimony filed by Defendants HAL Antillen NV, Holland America Line Inc, Holland America Line NV, Holland America Line USA Inc re20 MOTION for Leave Allowing Video or Telephonic Trial Testimony (Politis, Nicholas) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 04/24 4:13 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendants HAL Antillen NV, Holland America Line Inc, Holland America Line NV, Holland America Line USA Inc, to20 MOTION for Leave Allowing Video or Telephonic Trial Testimony . (Politis, Nicholas) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Leave
Tue 04/11 1:32 PM
MOTION for Leave Allowing Video or Telephonic Trial Testimony , filed by Plaintiff Joanne P. Jordan. Noting Date 4/28/2017, (Olsson, Marissa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name
Fri 03/31 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Marissa A. Olsson. Filed by Plaintiff Joanne P. Jordan. (Olsson, Marissa) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Unavailability
Fri 03/10 9:10 AM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Marissa A. Olsson for Plaintiff Joanne P. Jordan from 3/22/17 - 3/28/17. (Olsson, Marissa) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Unavailability
Wed 11/23 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Marissa A. Olsson for Plaintiff Joanne P. Jordan from 12/5/16 - 12/9/16. (Olsson, Marissa) |
|
Monday, November 14, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 11/14 11:18 AM
ORDER granting15 Stipulated Motion continuing Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) to 12/29/2016, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS) |
|
Tuesday, November 08, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Stipulated Motion
Tue 11/08 3:57 PM
Stipulated MOTION TO CONTINUE THE FRCP 26(a)(2) DUE DATE FOR DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES AND FOR EXCHANGE OF EXPERT WITNESS REPORTS, AND PROPOSED ORDER by Defendants HAL Antillen NV, Holland America Line Inc, Holland America Line NV, Holland America Line USA Inc. Noting Date 11/8/2016, (Politis, Nicholas) |
|
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
RSL Minute Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates
Mon 08/29 10:36 AM
AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 5 days. Jury Trial is set for 6/5/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Amended Pleadings due by 12/7/2016, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/7/2016, Discovery completed by 2/5/2017, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 2/19/2017, Dispositive motions due by 3/7/2017, Motions in Limine due by 5/8/2017, Pretrial Order due by 5/24/2017, Trial briefs to be submitted by 5/31/2017, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions and trial exhibits due by 5/31/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Continue
Wed 08/24 3:45 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Related Dates by Plaintiff Joanne P. Jordan. Noting Date 8/24/2016, (Olsson, Marissa) |
|
Tuesday, August 09, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 08/09 4:22 PM
ORDER granting11 Stipulated Motion to continue deadline for reports from expert witnesses; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/7/2016, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stipulated Motion
Mon 08/08 9:13 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Continue Deadline for Reports from Expert Witnesses by Plaintiff Joanne P. Jordan. Noting Date 8/8/2016, (Olsson, Marissa) |
|
Friday, May 20, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Unavailability
Fri 05/20 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Marissa A. Olsson for Plaintiff Joanne P. Jordan from May 27 - June 3, 2016. (Olsson, Marissa) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
RSL Minute Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates
Tue 02/16 1:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 5 days. Jury Trial is set for 3/6/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2016, Amended Pleadings due by 9/7/2016, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/7/2016, Discovery completed by 11/6/2016, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 11/20/2016, Dispositive motions due by 12/6/2016, Motions in Limine due by 2/6/2017, Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2017, Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/1/2017, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions and trial exhibits due by 3/1/2017 (KERR) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Joint Status Report
Tue 02/16 1:03 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: Five. (Ferguson, John) |
|
Monday, January 25, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Joint Status Report Order
Mon 01/25 12:05 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2016, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) |
|
Wednesday, December 23, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Wed 12/23 12:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Michele Rowe on 12/18/2015, filed by Plaintiff Joanne P. Jordan. (Olsson, Marissa) |
|
Wednesday, December 16, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 12/16 12:43 PM
Summons electronically issued as to defendant(s) HAL Antillen NV, Holland America Line - USA, Inc., Holland America Line N.V., Holland America Line, Inc.(ST) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
utility
Notice to Filer
Wed 12/16 11:54 AM
NOTICE TO FILER: In the future, when opening a new case, party text should be entered exactly as it appears on the Complaint caption. For questions about party text, please review the Attorney Case Opening Manual. The docket has now been corrected. Thank you. (ST) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 12/16 11:56 AM
Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (ST) |
||
Tuesday, December 15, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/15 2:46 PM
COMPLAINT For Damages against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND , filed by Joanne P. Jordan.(Olsson, Marissa) |
|
Att: 1 Summons HAL ANTILLEN N.V., | ||
Att: 2 Summons Holland America Line - USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Summons Holland America Line N.V., | ||
Att: 4 Summons Holland America Line, Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |