Mahoney v. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Denise L Cote |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-09841 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332dtp Diversity - Deceptive Trade Practices |
Case Filed: | Dec 17, 2015 |
Re-opened: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 14, 2016 5:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Generics Bidco I, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Generics Bidco II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Generics International (US Holdco), Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Generics International (US Midco), Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Generics International (US Parent), Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Generics International (US), Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vintage Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon Mahoney
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 10, 2020 | ||
111 | 111
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 08/10 5:00 PM
ORDER granting110 MOTION FOR CY PRES DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING SETTLEMENT. It is hereby ORDERED that the $181,936.51 in remaining undistributed settlement funds shall be distributed to the AADP Foundation, the charitable arm of the American Academy of Pediatric Dentistry ("AADP").. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/10/2020) (jca) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
110 | 110
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 08/07 9:47 PM
MOTION FOR CY PRES DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING SETTLEMENT FUNDS . Document filed by Shannon Mahoney..(Von Borke, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Schachter Dec., | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Rutkauskas Dec. |