BERNIE 2016, INC. v. DNC SERVICES CORPORATION
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Tanya S Chutkan |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-02211 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Dec 18, 2015 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 15, 2016 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
DNC SERVICES CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BERNIE 2016, INC.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Bernie Sanders Presidential Campaign Sues Democratic Party Over Data Access (wsj.com) |
Submitted Sat 12/19/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 03, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
.Order
Tue 05/03 4:49 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: In light of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal11 filed by the Plaintiff, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/3/16. (DJS) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 04/29 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BERNIE 2016, INC. (Griffin, Sean) |
|
Friday, April 08, 2016 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/08 3:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Granting10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by April 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/8/16. (DJS) |
||
Thursday, April 07, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/07 5:19 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by DNC SERVICES CORPORATION(Frost, Elisabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/07 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Felix Bauer on behalf of DNC SERVICES CORPORATION (Bauer, Robert) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/07 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth C. Frost on behalf of DNC SERVICES CORPORATION (Frost, Elisabeth) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Status Report
Thu 03/24 1:08 PM
Supplemental STATUS REPORT by BERNIE 2016, INC.. (Griffin, Sean) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Thu 03/24 1:04 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DNC SERVICES CORPORATION served on 3/17/2016, answer due 4/7/2016 (Griffin, Sean) |
|
Wednesday, March 23, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Transcript
Wed 03/23 3:19 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly held on 12-18-15; Page Numbers: 1-29. Date of Issuance:3-23-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa M. Foradori, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2016.(Foradori, Lisa) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2016 | ||
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 03/21 6:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff filed this action on 12/18/15 and the Clerk of the Court issued a summons on 12/21/15. It appears from the record that Plaintiff, has yet to effectuate service on the Defendant. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before 3/24/16, why the claims against Defendant should not be dismissed for failure to effectuate service. Plaintiff's failure to effectuate service or to satisfactorily respond to the present order by 3/24/16, may result in the dismissal of this action, without further notice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Show Cause Response due by 3/24/2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/21/16. (DJS) |
||
Friday, January 15, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Status Report
Fri 01/15 4:10 PM
STATUS REPORT by BERNIE 2016, INC.. (Griffin, Sean) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 01/15 7:15 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/15/2016 (zsm) |
||
Monday, January 11, 2016 | ||
order
.Order
Mon 01/11 1:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Not later than 1/15/16 Plaintiff shall file a notice of voluntary dismissal or a status report indicating whether Plaintiff has or intends to effectuate service of process. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/11/15. (DJS) |
||
Monday, December 21, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Mon 12/21 7:50 AM
SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to DNC SERVICES CORPORATION. (md) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Consent | ||
Friday, December 18, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/18 5:19 PM
COMPLAINT against DNC SERVICES CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4355281) filed by BERNIE 2016, INC..(Lambiotte, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 12/18 5:31 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (md) |