Zurich American Life Insurance Company v. Sergey Grishin et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Beverly Reid O'Conne |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-09681 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Dec 16, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 09, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 13, 2016 2:39 AM PDT |
Defendant
Dovi Frances
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sergey Grishin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Timothy Pinkevich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zurich American Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 09/09 9:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF CASE WITH PREJUDICE[FRCP 41(a)(1)]26 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. This action is hereby dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). Each party shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) |
|
Thursday, September 08, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 09/08 2:58 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Plaintiff Zurich American Life Insurance Company.(Murray, Misty) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 04, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 08/04 2:21 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Court has received a Notice of Settlement, filed July 29, 2016 (Docket No.24 ). The Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for August 15, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. The parties are ordered to file a Stipulation and Proposed Order Dismissing the action on or before September 12, 2016 or, in the alternative a Joint Status Report. Failure to comply with the Courts Order shall be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ah) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Settlement
Fri 07/29 10:32 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Zurich American Life Insurance Company. (Murray, Misty) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 07/08 4:46 PM
ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference22 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference is continued to 8/15/2016 at 1:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. All associated deadlines are also continued. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cw) |
|
22 | 22
stip
Continue
Fri 07/08 9:02 AM
STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from July 18, 2016 to August 15, 2016 and all associated deadlines Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only19 filed by Plaintiff Zurich American Life Insurance Company.(Murray, Misty) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 03, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 05/03 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Baum, Andrew) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Tue 05/03 11:36 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint filed by Defendants18 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (jp) |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 04/27 2:44 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi) |
|
18 | 18
15
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/27 2:24 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)7 filed by Defendants Dovi Frances, Sergey Grishin, Timothy Pinkevich.(Baum, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Extending Answer Due Deadline
Wed 04/13 8:32 AM
ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)16 The Court HEREBY ORDERS THAT: defendants Sergey Grishin, Timothy Pinkevich, and Dovi Frances shall have until April 27, 2016, to answer, move, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Zurich American Life Insurance Company's Complaint. (rfi) |
|
Monday, April 11, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Mon 04/11 4:48 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 27, 2016 Dovi Frances, Sergey Grishin, Timothy Pinkevich.(Baum, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Wed 03/16 11:14 AM
ORDER by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: The Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Initial Complaint14 is GRANTED. Defendants shall have until 4/13/2016 to respond. Counsel are reminded to comply with L.R. 5-4.4.2 and 11-3.8 in future filings. (cw) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Tue 03/15 12:36 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 13, 2016 Dovi Frances, Sergey Grishin, Timothy Pinkevich.(Attorney Andrew I Baum added to party Dovi Frances(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew I Baum added to party Sergey Grishin(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew I Baum added to party Timothy Pinkevich(pty:dft))(Baum, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 16, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 02/16 10:03 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)7 filed by Plaintiff Zurich American Life Insurance Company.(Murray, Misty) |
|
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 01/22 3:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Zurich American Life Insurance Company. upon Dovi Frances waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/17/2015, answer due 2/16/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Andrew Baum, Attorney, Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP. (Murray, Misty) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 01/22 3:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Zurich American Life Insurance Company. upon Timothy Pinkevich waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/17/2015, answer due 2/16/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Andrew Baum, Attorney, Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP. (Murray, Misty) |
|
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 01/22 3:03 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Zurich American Life Insurance Company. upon Sergey Grishin waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/17/2015, answer due 2/16/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Andrew Baum, Attorney, Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP. (Murray, Misty) |
|
Wednesday, January 13, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 01/13 9:01 AM
NOTICE REGARDING UPDATED STANDING ORDERS: Please take notice that Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell has updated the Court's Standing Orders. The Court ORDERS the parties to comply with any and all updated procedures. You can find the updated ORDERS on the Court's website, located at WWW.CACD.USCOURTS.GOV, under Judges Procedures and Schedules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 01/11 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 12/16/2015,, filed by Plaintiff Zurich American Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibit A)(Murray, Misty) |
|
Tuesday, December 29, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Seal Case
Tue 12/29 8:59 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell: Plaintiff's Application to Seal is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff shall file a redacted version of the Complaint and the accompanying exhibit on the public docket, redacting only those words, lines, and/or statements in the Complaint and the accompanying exhibit that specifically reference Defendant Grishin's private medical and health history. The Court has already received the unredacted versions of the Complaint and the attached exhibit; the parties need not provide additional copies to the Court. Plaintiff shall make the requisite filings in compliance with this Order by no later than 4:00 p.m. on Monday, January 11, 2016.1 (rfi) |
|
Wednesday, December 16, 2015 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rn) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Beverly Reid OConnell and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (rn) | |
3 | 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Zurich American Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich American Corporation for Zurich American Life Insurance Company. (rn) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Zurich American Life Insurance Company, (rn) | |
1 | 1 APPLICATION to File Complaint Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Zurich American Life Insurance Company. (rn) |