OnPower, Inc. et al v. United Power Line Contractors, LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Sheri Polster Chappell |
Referred: | Mac R Mccoy |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-00796 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Dec 23, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 20, 2016 5:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
Ryan Farris
|
|
Defendant
United Power Line Contractors, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Esch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
OnPower, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 09, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Judgment - Default
Tue 08/09 1:17 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT, filed against Ryan Farris. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/9/2016. (SPB) |
|
Friday, August 05, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 08/09 10:14 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. New case number: 2:15-cv-796-FtM-38MRM. Judge Unassigned Judge no longer assigned to the case. (SPB) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Fri 08/05 3:50 PM
ORDER adopting 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION for default judgment against Ryan Farris filed by Thomas Esch, OnPower, Inc.. The Report and Recommendation 22 is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED and the findings are incorporated herein. Defendant United Power Line Contractors LLC is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/5/2016. (LMF) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Fri 08/05 3:48 PM
ORDER adopting 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION for default judgment against Ryan Farris filed by Thomas Esch, OnPower, Inc. The Report and Recommendation 21 is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED and the findings are incorporated herein. Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Entry of Default Judgment against Ryan Farris 16 is GRANTED. Default judgment shall be entered against Ryan Farris, individually, in the amount of $100,000.00.The Court finds the Settlement Agreement is valid and enforceable as to Ryan Farris; that Ryan Farris' guarantee obligation to Thomas Esch under the Addendum is valid and enforceable; that Ryan Farris' obligation to pay Thomas Esch is now due; and that there are no remaining conditions precedent to Defendant Farris' payment obligations to Thomas Esch. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/5/2016. (LMF) |
|
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Affidavit
Thu 07/28 7:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Neil Guttenberg by OnPower, Inc.. (Stanco, Eric) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 06/09 11:08 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the present action as to Defendant United Power Line Contractors LLC be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/9/2016. (JTM) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 06/09 11:02 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that 16 Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Entry of Default Judgment against Ryan Farris be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/9/2016. (JTM) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/09 4:37 PM
NOTICE by Thomas Esch, OnPower, Inc. re17 Order pdf Notice of Filing Exhibits (Stanco, Eric) |
|
19 | 19
order
Amended Order
Mon 05/09 3:17 PM
AMENDED ORDER amending 17 . By no later than May 13, 2016, Plaintiffs are ordered to provide the Court with the exhibits referenced in their Complaint by filing a Notice of Filing. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/9/2016. (JTM) |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order to show cause
Wed 04/13 1:31 PM
ORDER to show cause as to Plaintiffs Thomas Esch and OnPower, Inc. Within 14 days, the Court orders Plaintiffs to show cause why the claims against Defendant United Power Line Contractors LLC should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/13/2016. (JTM) |
|
17 | 17
order
*Order pdf
Wed 04/13 1:26 PM
ORDER requiring Plaintiffs to provide the Court with the exhibits referenced in their 1 Complaint by filing a Notice of Filing. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/13/2016. (JTM) |
|
Friday, March 18, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 03/18 8:52 AM
MOTION for default judgment against Ryan Farris by All Plaintiffs. (Stanco, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Wed 03/16 9:05 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ryan Farris (SPB) |
|
Monday, March 14, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on motion for default Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Mon 03/14 4:51 PM
ORDER granting 8 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default as to Defendant Ryan Farris; and denying without prejudice 9 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default as to Defendant United Power Line Contractors LLC. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter a default against Defendant Ryan Farris. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/14/2016. (JTM) |
|
Friday, March 04, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Fri 03/04 12:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re3 Interested persons orderRelated case order and track 2 notice by Thomas Esch, OnPower, Inc.. (Stanco, Eric) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Fri 03/04 12:22 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Thomas Esch, OnPower, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Stanco, Eric) |
|
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thu 03/03 4:52 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice 10 Motion for Default Judgment. The Plaintiffs filed their Motion for Default Judgment prior to the entry of a clerk's default. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55, a clerk's default must be entered before a default judgment may be entered. Since a clerk's default has not yet been entered by the Court, the Motion for Default Judgment is premature and due to be denied as such. Therefore, the Motion for Default Judgment (Doc. #10) is DENIED as premature and without prejudice. The Plaintiffs may file a new motion for default judgment once a clerk's default has been entered in this case.. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/3/2016. (DK) |
|
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 02/29 10:22 PM
MOTION for default judgment against All Defendants by All Plaintiffs.(Stanco, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit supporting Declaration of Thomas Esch | ||
Tuesday, February 23, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Clerk's default
Tue 02/23 3:33 PM
MOTION for entry of clerk's default against United Power Line Contractors, LLC by All Plaintiffs.(Stanco, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Soldiers and Sailors affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit supporting affidavit | ||
8 | 8
motion
Default
Tue 02/23 3:29 PM
MOTION for default Ryan Farris for failure to plead re6 Proof of service by All Plaintiffs.(Stanco, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Soldiers and Sailors affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit supporting affidavit | ||
7 | 7
service
Proof of service
Tue 02/23 3:25 PM
PROOF of service by Thomas Esch (Stanco, Eric) |
|
6 | 6
service
Proof of service
Tue 02/23 3:24 PM
PROOF of service by Thomas Esch (Stanco, Eric) |
|
Thursday, January 21, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons issued
Thu 01/21 1:08 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Ryan Farris. (SPB) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Thu 01/21 1:05 PM
SUMMONS issued as to United Power Line Contractors, LLC. (SPB) (SPB) |
|
Monday, December 28, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Interested persons order Related case order and track 2 notice
Mon 12/28 12:22 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER( Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/11/2016.), RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2.( Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/11/2016.) Signed by Judge Unassigned Judge on 12/28/2015.(BJH) |
|
Att: 1 Main Document | ||
Wednesday, December 23, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
order
Standing Order re: 25 pages
Thu 12/24 11:04 AM
STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/23/2015. (RMT) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/24 10:56 AM
COMPLAINT against Ryan Farris, United Power Line Contractors, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number FTM008712), no exhibits was received with complaint filed by OnPower, Inc., Thomas Esch.(RMT) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |