Continuity, LLC
Connecticut Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Julie A Manning |
Case #: | 3:15-bk-32092 |
Case Filed: | Dec 28, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 18, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Continuity, LLC
39 Elm St Ste 6
West Haven, CT 06516-3868 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U. S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee Giaimo Federal Building 150 Court Street, Room 302
New Haven, CT 06510 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, March 18, 2016 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 03/18 11:37 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Esposito, Pamela) |
||
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case
Fri 03/04 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 03/03/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 01, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 03/01 8:30 AM
Order Dismissing Case For Continuity, LLC. (VanKruiningen, Karen) |
|
court
Meeting of Creditors Not Held
Tue 03/01 4:06 PM
Meeting of Creditors Not Held, Meeting of Creditors Off Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Mackey, Steven) |
||
Wednesday, February 24, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
audio
Digital Audio Recording
Wed 02/24 7:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/24/2016 11:10:36 AM ]. File Size [ 2433 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:46 ]. (courtspeak) |
|
court
Hearing Held
Tue 03/01 8:32 AM
Hearing Held . ..Order to Enter Dismissing Case.. (VanKruiningen, Karen) |
||
Monday, February 22, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
4
pgs
misc
Response
Mon 02/22 4:24 PM
Response Filed by James M. Nugent on behalf of The Salce Companies, LLC Creditor, . (Nugent, James) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
court
Notice of Hearing Set
Wed 02/17 8:30 AM
Notice of Hearing Set . Hearing to be held on 3/9/2016 at 10:00 AM at 18th Floor, Courtroom. (VanKruiningen, Karen) |
|
court
Meeting of Creditors Adjourned (Continued)
Wed 02/17 6:19 PM
Meeting of Creditors Not Held, Statement Adjourning 341(a)Meeting of Creditors. Filed by U.S. Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Continued to 3/1/2016 at 04:00 PM at Office of the UST. (Mackey, Steven) |
||
Friday, January 29, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 01/29 3:12 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by James M. Nugent on behalf of The Salce Companies, LLC Creditor, . (Nugent, James) |
|
16 | 16
court
Notice of Hearing Set
Fri 01/29 12:11 PM
Notice of Hearing Set . Hearing to be held on 2/24/2016 at 10:00 AM at 18th Floor, Courtroom. (VanKruiningen, Karen) |
|
Wednesday, January 27, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Objection
Wed 01/27 3:47 PM
Objection Filed by David C. Pite on behalf of Continuity, LLC Debtor, . (Pite, David) |
|
Wednesday, January 20, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Relief from Stay
Wed 01/20 8:25 AM
Amended Motion for Relief from Stay regarding 946 Ferry Boulevard, Stratford, CT. (to reflect missing pages 2 & 3) Filed by James M. Nugent on behalf of The Salce Companies, LLC, Creditor (Nugent, James) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
10
pgs
motion
Relief from Stay
Thu 01/14 2:39 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay regarding 946 Ferry Boulevard, Stratford, CT. Fee Amount $176. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. Filed by James M. Nugent on behalf of The Salce Companies, LLC, Creditor. Contested Matter Response(s) due by 01/28/2016. (Nugent, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A - H | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Contested Matter Response Deadline with Certification | ||
crditcrd
none
Thu 01/14 2:40 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay 15-32092 [motion,mrlfsty] ( 176.00) filing fee - $ 176.00. Receipt number 7002542. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, January 11, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
22
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 01/11 3:34 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Schedules,statement of financial affairs . Filed by David C. Pite on behalf of Continuity, LLC Debtor, . (Pite, David) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Employ
Thu 01/07 10:30 AM
Application to Employ Pite Law Office LLC as Attorney Filed by David C. Pite on behalf of Continuity, LLC, Debtor. (Pite, David) |
|
Saturday, January 02, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
misc
Affidavit
Sat 01/02 12:59 PM
Affidavit Re:1116 documents Filed by David C. Pite on behalf of Continuity, LLC Debtor, . (Pite, David) |
|
Thursday, December 31, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Fri 01/01 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 12/31/2015. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 01/01 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 12/31/2015. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 01/01 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 12/31/2015. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 30, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 12/30 10:05 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by James M. Nugent on behalf of The Salce Companies, LLC Creditor, . (Nugent, James) |
|
Tuesday, December 29, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Pay Taxes - State
Tue 12/29 12:55 PM
Order to Pay Taxes - State. (Esposito, Pamela) |
|
4 | 4
order
Pay Taxes - Federal
Tue 12/29 12:55 PM
Order to Pay Taxes - Federal. (Esposito, Pamela) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Tue 12/29 12:54 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/1/2016 at 10:00 AM at Office of the UST. Proofs of Claims due by 5/2/2016. (Esposito, Pamela) |
|
Monday, December 28, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Tue 12/29 12:44 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by David C. Pite on behalf of Continuity, LLC Debtor, . (Esposito, Pamela) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 12/28 8:48 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. Missing Documents:, B21 Form, due at time of filing. Atty Disclosure Statement Re: 2016(b), Exhibit A, Credit Counseling and or Exigent Certificate, Form 122B Schedule A/B-J, Statement of Financial Affairs, Statement of Intent due by 01/11/2016. Statistical Summary of Schedules Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 01/11/2016. Filed by Continuity, LLC. (Pite, David) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 12/28 8:49 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-32092 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) filing fee - $1717.00. Receipt number 6978900. (U.S. Treasury) |