Infinite Computer Solutions, Inc. v. iYogi, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Gardephe |
Case #: | 7:15-cv-10076 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Dec 28, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 25, 2016 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
iYogi, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Infinite Computer Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Wed 03/09 6:17 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Katherine Skeele dated March 9, 2016 re: Joint request for reassignment to the Foley Square Courthouse. Document filed by Infinite Computer Solutions, Inc..(Skeele, Katherine) |
|
Tuesday, March 08, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Tue 03/08 4:48 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Robert M. Steckman dated March 8, 2016 re: Request to appear at initial court conference by telephone. Document filed by iYogi, Inc..(Steckman, Robert) |
|
Thursday, March 03, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 03/03 2:22 PM
NOTICE of INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties herein shall attend a conference for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.16 on March 16, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 621, Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, New York. (Initial Conference set for 3/16/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Cathy Seibel.) (yv) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/02 5:26 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by iYogi, Inc..(Steckman, Robert) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/02 5:24 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by iYogi, Inc..(Steckman, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 02/03 9:39 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE AGAINST, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that the time for Defendant iYogi, Inc. to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Infinite Computer Solutions, Inc. Complaint is extended to March 2, 2016. The original deadline for iYogi, Inc. to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Complaint was January 29, 2016. This is the first request for an extension of Defendants' time to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Defendants hereby waive any and all defenses relating to improper service of process. So Ordered. (iYogi, Inc. answer due 3/2/2016.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 2/2/16) (yv) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Thu 01/14 4:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. iYogi, Inc. served on 1/8/2016, answer due 1/29/2016. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, an agent of the Secretary of State. Service was made by Hand. Document filed by Infinite Computer Solutions, Inc.. (Skeele, Katherine) |
|
Monday, December 28, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 12/29 9:24 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to iYogi, Inc. (vf) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 12/28 4:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to iYogi, Inc., re:3 Complaint. Document filed by Infinite Computer Solutions, Inc.. (Skeele, Katherine) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/28 4:43 PM
COMPLAINT against iYogi, Inc.. Document filed by Infinite Computer Solutions, Inc..(Skeele, Katherine) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 12/28 4:24 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Infinite Computer Solutions (Ltd.) for Infinite Computer Solutions, Inc.. Document filed by Infinite Computer Solutions, Inc..(Skeele, Katherine) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 12/28 4:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Skeele, Katherine) |
|
misc
Case Opening Fee Paid via Pay.gov
Tue 12/29 9:09 AM
Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for3 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number 0208-11779280, paid on 12/28/2015. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 12/29 9:17 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 12/29 9:18 AM
Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 12/29 9:18 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |