Paramount Pictures Corporation et al v. Axanar Productions, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-09938 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 29, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 26, 2016 2:27 AM PDT |
Amicus
Language Creation Society
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Axanar Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Alec Peters
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
CBS Studios Inc
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Paramount Pictures Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Axanar Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Alec Peters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CBS Studios Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paramount Pictures Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
213 | 213
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 04/05 10:22 AM
NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. All documents lodged by the plaintiffs pursuant to the Notice of Lodging, filed at docket entry 72, attachment 63, were returned to plaintiff on April 5, 2018. The DVDs, etc., were picked up by Juventino Garcia Arellano of Nationwide Legal. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) |