Shaffer v. Armed Forces Insurance Corporation
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel D Crabtree |
Referred: | Gerald L Rushfelt |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-09941 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Dec 31, 2015 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 28, 2016 4:04 AM CDT |
Defendant
Armed Forces Insurance Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ebony Shaffer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, November 14, 2016 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 11/14 4:09 PM
***Civil Case Terminated.(ydm) |
||
Thursday, November 10, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 11/10 3:17 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Armed Forces Insurance Corporation. (Story, Julianne) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 10/26 7:34 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Final Pretrial Conference reset for 12/6/2016 at 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt. The conference will be held by telephone. Counsel and any pro se parties should call 1-888-363-4749, access number 8533057, for the conference.(yh) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Thu 10/06 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Henry J. Thomas as to Armed Forces Insurance Corporation (Thomas, Henry) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/04 4:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures by Armed Forces Insurance Corporation. (Thomas, Henry) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Tue 09/27 4:06 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Armed Forces Insurance Corporation of taking deposition of Ebony Shaffer on 10/10/16 (Story, Julianne) |
|
Wednesday, September 21, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 09/21 2:03 PM
ORDER granting21 Defendant's Amended Motion to Extend Discovery Response Date. Plaintiff does not oppose the motion. Defendant seeks an extension of time to identify any responsive defense expert witnesses until three weeks from the date it receives Plaintiff's medical records from her physician. Defendant states that it has been unable to retrieve those records, and thus needs additional time to retrieve and review the records before it is able to identify responsive expert witnesses. The Court grants Defendant's motion and extends the deadline for the identification of experts through November 30, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 9/21/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gt) |
|
Thursday, September 01, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 09/01 5:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to Extend Discovery Response Date by Defendant Armed Forces Insurance Corporation (Thomas, Henry) |
|
20 | 20
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Thu 09/01 5:15 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Armed Forces Insurance Corporation of taking deposition of Ebony Shaffer on September 27, 2016 (Thomas, Henry) |
|
Thursday, August 25, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/25 12:55 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Amended Expert Witness Identification by Ebony Shaffer (Kuhl, Albert) |
|
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/16 10:07 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Expert Witness Identification by Armed Forces Insurance Corporation. (Thomas, Henry) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/08 3:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Expert Witness Identification by Ebony Shaffer (Kuhl, Albert) |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 07/06 5:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents by Armed Forces Insurance Corporation. (Thomas, Henry) |
|
Tuesday, June 28, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 06/28 4:49 PM
ORDER granting as unopposed14 Defendant's Amended Motion to Extend Discovery Response Date. The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's interrogatories and requests for documents is extended to July 6, 2016. The Court finds the initial motion13 moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 6/28/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mhs) |
|
Thursday, June 23, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 06/23 2:41 PM
Amended MOTION for extension of time to Extend Discovery Response Date by Defendant Armed Forces Insurance Corporation (Thomas, Henry) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 06/22 5:13 PM
MOTION for extension of time to Extend Discovery Response Date by Defendant Armed Forces Insurance Corporation (Thomas, Henry) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 06/21 3:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Ebony Shaffer (Kuhl, Albert) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/23 3:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Interrogatories & First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant by Ebony Shaffer (Kuhl, Albert) |
|
Tuesday, May 17, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Protective Order
Tue 05/17 4:18 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER limiting the disclosure, dissemination, and use of certain identified categories of confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 5/17/2016. (mhs) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 05/13 10:56 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Armed Forces Insurance Corporation. (Thomas, Henry) |
|
Wednesday, April 27, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 04/27 11:10 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation deadline 11/1/2016. Discovery deadline 11/11/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/29/2016. Dispositive motion deadline 12/1/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2016 at 02:15 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt.Jury Trial set for 8/1/2017 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom (Unknown) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Estimated trial time 4 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 4/26/2016. (mg) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Fri 04/22 7:48 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt: PHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/21/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (yh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/21 12:56 PM
NOTICE of change of phone number to dial into re4 Order Setting Scheduling Conference at 1:15 p.m. Counsel and any pro se parties should call 1-888-363-4749, access number is 8533057, for the conference. (yh) |
|
Monday, April 11, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/11 3:59 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement by Ebony Shaffer (Kuhl, Albert) |
|
Thursday, February 11, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Setting Scheduling Conference
Thu 02/11 3:43 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2016 at 01:15 PM in Telephone before Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt. Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Deadline set for 3/31/2016. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 4/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 2/11/2016. (mg) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/08 3:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Armed Forces Insurance Corporation.(Story, Julianne) |
|
Monday, January 04, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 01/04 10:51 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm) |
||
misc
Filing Fee Paid
Mon 01/04 12:05 PM
FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $400, receipt number K4631050490. (ydm) |
||
Thursday, December 31, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 12/31 11:24 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Armed Forces Insurance Corporation. (Story, Julianne) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 12/31 11:22 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the District Court of Leavenworth County, Kansas, case number 2015-CV-000337 , filed by Armed Forces Insurance Corporation.(Story, Julianne) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Petition Exhibit A |