Landmark American Insurance Co v. Kohler Co et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | James T Trimble, Jr |
Referred: | Kathleen Kay |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00008 |
Nature of Suit | 385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 05, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 03, 2016 3:18 AM CDT |
Defendant
Kohler Co
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sloan Valve Co
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Landmark American Insurance Co
|
Represented By
|
SELECTION REQUIRED
Kohler Co
|
Represented By
|
SELECTION REQUIRED
Landmark American Insurance Co
|
|
SELECTION REQUIRED
SLOAN VALVE COMPANY
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Fri 12/09 3:17 PM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL granting16 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 12/09/16. (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Thu 12/08 9:54 AM
JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss lawsuit in its entirety by Landmark American Insurance Co.(aty,Brock, Carin) Modified on 12/8/2016 to capture proper motion event. (Putch, A) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment - Dismissal (30,60,90 day)
Tue 10/11 3:31 PM
60 DAY JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/11/16. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Thu 04/21 4:32 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER (Judge Minaldi's Order was erroneously issued, content of Judge Trimble's the same except for #5) (crt,FinnSld, P) |
|
13 | 13
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 04/21 2:07 PM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/21/2016. Participating by telephone: Carin Dorman Brock for plaintiff, Joshua Hendry Dierker for Kohler Co., and Paul L. Veazey, Jr., for Sloan Valve Co. Jury Trial is set for 2/13/2017 at 09:30 AM in Lake Charles, Courtroom 1 before Judge James T Trimble Jr. The parties are cautioned that no motion for continuance will be granted absent a showing of good cause. Neither the fact that the parties are not prepared for trial nor the fact that all parties agree to a continuance will be considered as constituting good cause. The parties are also directed to the WDLA website at www.lawd.uscourts.gov, particularly the form page for Judge Trimble, for guidance as to pretrial deadlines that will apply to this case unless otherwise ordered. (jud,Kay, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, April 14, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Thu 04/14 9:35 AM
RULE 26(f) Report by Landmark American Insurance Co . (aty,Brock, Carin) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 03/24 1:35 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER setting the Scheduling Conference for 4/21/2016 at 2:00 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 3/24/2016. (crt,FinnSld, P) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Response to Removal Order
Fri 02/05 10:55 AM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Kohler Co .(aty,McDaniel, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Petition for Damges, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Plaintiff to Clerk September 8, 2015, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Plaintiff to Clerk October 22, 2015, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Citation Issued to Kohler Company, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Citation Issued to Sloan Valve Company, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F-Notice to State Court of Removal, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G-Kolher to Clerk January 5, 2016, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H-Kohler to Clerk Januery 6, 2016 | ||
Friday, January 22, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/22 12:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses to Petition for Damages by Sloan Valve Co.(aty,Veazey, Paul) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 01/14 11:01 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kohler Co.(aty,McDaniel, Keith) |
|
Tuesday, January 12, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 01/12 1:08 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Landmark American Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent R S U I Indemnity Co for Landmark American Insurance Co. (aty,Brock, Carin) |
|
Thursday, January 07, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Removal Order
Fri 01/08 4:20 PM
REMOVAL ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on January 7, 2016. (crt,Benoit, T) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/07 5:50 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kohler Co. (aty,McDaniel, Keith) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/07 10:52 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sloan Valve Co.(aty,Veazey, Paul) Modified on 1/7/2016 to edit text. (Putch, A) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 01/06 1:56 PM
NOTICE by SLOAN VALVE COMPANY of Consent of Removal (aty,Veazey, Paul) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Wed 01/06 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to Keith W McDaniel, Joshua Henry Dierker on behalf of Kohler Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/20/2016. (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
Tuesday, January 05, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 01/05 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2015-3641 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-2970048) filed by Kohler Co.(Attorney Keith W McDaniel added to party Kohler Co(pty:selreq))(aty,McDaniel, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance, | ||
Att: 2 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 3 State court petition Exhibit "A", | ||
Att: 4 State court citation Exhibit "B", | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit State Court Record | ||
service
State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)
Wed 01/06 9:02 AM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed: Kohler Co, Sloan Valve Co answer due 1/12/2016. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #5 OF DOCUMENT1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 01/06 9:04 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge James T Trimble, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M) |