Enigma Software Group USA, LLC v. Bleeping Computer LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00057 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 05, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 03, 2016 5:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bleeping Computer LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1-10
|
|
Plaintiff
Enigma Software Group USA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
72 | 72
order
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 03/02 1:00 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(A)(ii) and Rule 41(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff Enigma Software Group USA, LLC and Defendant Bleeping Computer LLC (collectively, the "Parties") hereby stipulate and agree to dismissal of the above-captioned action, and all claims and counterclaims asserted therein, with prejudice, and with each Party to bear its own costs and fees. The undersigned attests that all other signatories listed, and on whose behalf this filing is submitted, concur in the filing's content and have authorized this filing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/2/2017) (anc) |
|
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Wed 03/08 3:50 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines re:43 . (anc) |